EP1550813 - ROLLING ELEMENT BEARING UNIT WITH SENSOR AND HUB UNIT WITH SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [2009/43] |
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | ||
Former [2005/27] | For all designated states KOYO SEIKO CO., LTD. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka 542-0081 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INOUE, Masahiro, c/o Koyo Seido Co., Ltd. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-00 81 / JP | 02 /
SAKAMOTO, Kenji, c/o Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-0081 / JP | 03 /
KOYAGI, Katsura, c/o Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-00 81 / JP | [2005/27] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/27] | TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 03725799.5 | 16.05.2003 | [2005/27] | WO2003JP06105 | Priority number, date | JP20020142417 | 17.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002142417 | JP20030023378 | 31.01.2003 Original published format: JP 2003023378 | JP20030023375 | 31.01.2003 Original published format: JP 2003023375 | JP20030066107 | 12.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003066107 | [2005/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03102434 | Date: | 11.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1550813 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1550813 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16C19/52, F16C41/00, F16C33/38, F16C19/18, G01P3/481, G01G19/12, G01L15/00, B60B35/18 | [2005/27] | CPC: |
F16C19/522 (EP,US);
B60B27/00 (EP,US);
B60B27/0005 (EP,US);
B60B27/0026 (EP,US);
B60B27/0042 (EP,US);
B60B27/0068 (EP,US);
B60B27/0094 (EP,US);
G01L5/0023 (EP,US);
G01P3/443 (EP,US);
F16C19/163 (EP,US);
F16C19/186 (EP,US);
F16C2300/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/36] |
Former [2005/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | WALZELEMENTLAGEREINHEIT MIT SENSOR UND NABENEINHEIT MIT SENSOR | [2005/27] | English: | ROLLING ELEMENT BEARING UNIT WITH SENSOR AND HUB UNIT WITH SENSOR | [2005/27] | French: | UNITE DE ROULEMENT A ROULEAUX AVEC CAPTEUR ET UNITE DE MOYEU AVEC CAPTEUR | [2005/27] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2004 | Translation filed | 30.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2004 | Search fee paid | 30.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/27] | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 16.05.2010 | [2011/35] | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPS60244811 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [Y]JPH01206113 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN, et al); | [A]EP0432122 (SKF NOVA AB [SE]); | [Y]JPH03125917U ; | [Y]JPH0542749U ; | [Y]JPH09174384 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP); | [Y]JP2001021577 (NSK LTD); | [Y]JP2001033322 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD) |