EP1506883 - HUB UNIT WITH SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.04.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.05.2011 [2011/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | ||
Former [2005/07] | For all designated states Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-0081 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INOUE, Masahiro, KOYO SEIKO CO., LTD. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-0081 / JP | [2005/07] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/07] | TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 03725800.1 | 16.05.2003 | [2005/07] | WO2003JP06106 | Priority number, date | JP20020142413 | 17.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002142413 | JP20020142415 | 17.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002142415 | [2005/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03097381 | Date: | 27.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1506883 | Date: | 16.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.11.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01L5/00, B60T8/00, B60B35/14, B60B27/00, B23P11/02, F16C19/38, F16C19/52, F16C41/00 | [2009/26] | CPC: |
G01L5/0023 (EP,US);
B60B27/0026 (EP,US);
B60B27/0042 (EP,US);
B60B27/0068 (EP,US);
B60B27/0084 (EP,US);
B60G17/019 (EP,US);
F16C19/522 (EP,US);
G01L5/0019 (EP,US);
B60G2204/115 (EP,US);
B60T2240/06 (EP,US);
F16C19/186 (EP,US);
F16C2326/02 (EP,US);
F16C41/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/07] | B60B35/14, F16C19/38, F16C19/52, F16C41/00, G01L5/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/36] |
Former [2005/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | NABENEINHEIT MIT SENSOR | [2005/07] | English: | HUB UNIT WITH SENSOR | [2005/07] | French: | UNITE DE MOYEU A DETECTEUR | [2005/07] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2004 | Translation filed | 09.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2004 | Search fee paid | 09.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2004 | Examination requested [2005/07] | 15.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 08.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/18] | 13.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1176409 (ROULEMENTS SOC NOUVELLE [FR]) [X] 1,2* paragraphs [0027] , [0028] , [0041] - [0044] - [0053] - [0056] - [0062] , [0078] - [0081]; figure - *; | [XP]DE10105298 (FAG AUTOMOBILTECHNIK AG [DE]) [XP] 1,2 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0030]; figures 7a,1-6 * | International search | [A]JPS4717484 ; | [A]JPS60102536 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD, et al); | [A]JPH02253009 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN, et al); | [A]JPH03209016 (SKF NOVA AB); | [A]JPH03273948 (NIHON DENSHI KOGYO KK); | [A]JPH08152370 (NIPPON DENSHI KOGYO KK); | [A]JPH09292294 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JPH1073501 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG); | [A]JP2001296175 (YAZAKI CORP) |