EP1495228 - DIRECT CONNECTION MANIFOLD FOR RECIPROCATING PISTON PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Graco Minnesota Inc. 60 11th Avenue N.E. Minneapolis, MN 55413 / US | [2005/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOMPSON, David 19850 Quapaw Street NW Oak Grove, MN 55303 / US | 02 /
GUNDERSEN, Robert 7810 Padgett Avenue NE Otsego, MN 55330 / US | 03 /
HORNING, Jerry 2840 123rd Avenue NW Coon Rapids, MN 55443 / US | [2005/02] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/02] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 03726175.7 | 02.04.2003 | [2005/02] | WO2003US10056 | Priority number, date | US20020369950P | 05.04.2002 Original published format: US 369950 P | [2005/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03087578 | Date: | 23.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1495228 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F04B49/03, F04B53/16 | [2007/14] | CPC: |
F04B53/16 (EP,US);
F04B49/00 (KR);
F04B39/00 (KR);
F04B49/03 (EP,US);
F04B2205/04 (EP,US);
F04B2205/05 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/02] | F04B49/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIREKTVERBINDUNGSVERTEILER FÜR HUBKOLBENPUMPE | [2005/02] | English: | DIRECT CONNECTION MANIFOLD FOR RECIPROCATING PISTON PUMP | [2005/02] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR A CONNEXION DIRECTE POUR POMPE ALTERNATIVE | [2005/02] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2004 | Search fee paid | 05.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/02] | 27.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/23] | 14.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4773833 (WILKINSON BRUCE S [US], et al) [Y] 1,2 * abstract * * column 1, lines 13-29 * * column 2, lines 50-53 * * claim 13 *; | [X]EP0419984 (VICKERS INC [US]) [X] 1,2 * figure 5 * * column 4, lines 38-51 * * column 5, lines 7-18 ** column 10, lines 21-32 *; | [XY]US5127547 (GERICH HORST [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 3, lines 51-57 * * column 5, lines 18-23 * * claim 1 * [Y] 2; | [DY]US6220487 (SRIVASTAVA NILENDU [US], et al) [DY] 1,2 * abstract * * column 3, lines 51-63 * | International search | [Y]US6220487 (SRIVASTAVA NILENDU [US], et al) |