EP1504204 - DAMPING MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Gates Corporation 1551 Wewatta Street Denver, CO 80202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/06] | For all designated states The Gates Corporation 1551 Wewatta Street Denver, Colorado 80202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SERKH, Alexander 316 Falling Brook Drive Troy, MI 48098-4696 / US | 02 /
GAO, Litang 48500 Amber Lane Dr. Shelby Twp., MI 48315 / US | 03 /
JEVTIC, Zoran 30208 Eastfield Farmington Hills, MI 48334 / US | 04 /
HAO, Minchun 1558 Cherry Lawn Cres. Windsor, Ontario N9E 1P4 / CA | [2005/06] | Representative(s) | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2005/06] | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03726393.6 | 18.04.2003 | [2005/06] | WO2003US12374 | Priority number, date | US20020147183 | 15.05.2002 Original published format: US 147183 | [2005/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03098071 | Date: | 27.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1504204 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1504204 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16H7/12 | [2005/06] | CPC: |
F16H7/1218 (EP,US);
F16H7/12 (KR);
F16H2007/081 (EP,US);
F16H2007/084 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/06] | Title | German: | DÄMPFERMECHANISMUS | [2005/06] | English: | DAMPING MECHANISM | [2005/06] | French: | MECANISME D'AMORTISSEMENT | [2005/06] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2003 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 10.12.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.03.2006 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.04.2003 | AT | 19.10.2011 | BE | 19.10.2011 | CY | 19.10.2011 | CZ | 19.10.2011 | DK | 19.10.2011 | EE | 19.10.2011 | FI | 19.10.2011 | NL | 19.10.2011 | RO | 19.10.2011 | SI | 19.10.2011 | SK | 19.10.2011 | BG | 19.01.2012 | GR | 20.01.2012 | PT | 20.02.2012 | IE | 18.04.2012 | LU | 18.04.2012 | CH | 30.04.2012 | LI | 30.04.2012 | MC | 30.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 19.10.2011 | |
BE | 19.10.2011 | ||
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
FI | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
IE | 18.04.2012 | ||
LU | 18.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 19.10.2011 | |
BE | 19.10.2011 | ||
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
FI | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
IE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 19.10.2011 | |
BE | 19.10.2011 | ||
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
IE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 19.10.2011 | |
BE | 19.10.2011 | ||
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | BE | 19.10.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US1645576 (MARCELLIN BECONNIER PAUL) [A] * figure - *; | [X]DE4029940 (KUGELFISCHER G SCHAEFER & CO [DE]) [X] 1-5,7,10-15,19-21,23 * figure - *; | [Y]EP0636815 (CONTINENTAL AG [DE]) [Y] 8,9,16-18,24 * figure 2 *; | [DA]US5632697 (SERKH ALEXANDER [CA]) [DA] * figure - *; | [DX]DE19647224 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [DX] 1-5,7,10-15,19-21,23 * figure - *; | [DXY]US2002010045 (SERKH ALEXANDER [US]) [DX] 1-7,10-15,19-23 * figures 15-25; claim 19 * [Y] 8,9,16-18,24 | by applicant | US5632697 | US20010861338 |