EP1504357 - INDUSTRIAL IT SYSTEM FOR DISTRIBUTION/POWER TRANSFORMERS MANUFACTURING MATERIAL CONTROL WITH SUPPLIERS SYSTEMS INTEGRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.01.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Research Ltd. P.O. Box 8131 8050 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/06] | For all designated states ABB RESEARCH LTD. P.O. Box 8131 8050 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAYOUMI, Deia, Salah-Eldin 2621 Hidden Meadow Drive Fuquay Varina, NC 27526 / US | 02 /
VICK, William, J. 210 Firetree Lane Cary, NC 27513 / US | [2005/06] | Representative(s) | Collins, John David Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/06] | Collins, John David Marks & Clerk, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 03726557.6 | 30.04.2003 | [2005/06] | WO2003US13530 | Priority number, date | US20020377047P | 30.04.2002 Original published format: US 377047 P | US20020377251P | 30.04.2002 Original published format: US 377251 P | US20020377235P | 30.04.2002 Original published format: US 377235 P | US20020377241P | 30.04.2002 Original published format: US 377241 P | US20020377246P | 30.04.2002 Original published format: US 377246 P | [2005/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03094018 | Date: | 13.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1504357 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.11.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/16, G06F17/60 | [2005/06] | CPC: |
G06Q10/00 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
G06Q10/087 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0201 (EP,US);
Y04S10/50 (EP,US);
Y04S50/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INDUSTRIELLES IT-SYSTEM ZUR VERTEILUNG BZW. LEISTUNGSTRANSFORMATORHERSTELLUNGSMATERIAL-STEUERUNG MIT LIEFERANTENSYSTEMINTEGRATION | [2005/06] | English: | INDUSTRIAL IT SYSTEM FOR DISTRIBUTION/POWER TRANSFORMERS MANUFACTURING MATERIAL CONTROL WITH SUPPLIERS SYSTEMS INTEGRATION | [2005/06] | French: | SYSTEME DE TECHNOLOGIE DE L'INFORMATION INDUSTRIELLE POUR LE CONTROLE DU MATERIEL DE FABRICATION DES TRANSFORMATEURS DE PUISSANCE/DISTRIBUTION AVEC UNE INTEGRATION DES SYSTEMES DES FOURNISSEURS | [2005/06] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2004 | Search fee paid | 26.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 12.01.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2006 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   12.06.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search | International search | [X]US2002052807 (HAN TAO-YAG [US], et al); | [X]US2002019761 (LIDOW DEREK [US]); | [X]US5937388 (DAVIS JAMES W [US], et al) |