EP1509829 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR AUGMENTING PHYSICAL LAYER ARQ IN A WIRELESS DATA COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm, Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2005/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOHANTY, Bibhu P. 10716 Stallions Lane San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 02 /
ESTEVES, Eduardo 14005H Mango Drive Del Mar, California 92014 / US | 03 /
GURELLI, Mehmet I. 3717 Nobel Drive, 1329 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | [2007/39] |
Former [2006/28] | 01 /
MOHANTY, Bibhu 4028 Mahaila Avenue, C San Diego, CA 92122 / US | ||
02 /
ESTEVES, Eduardo 14005H Mango Drive Del Mar, California 92014 / US | |||
03 /
GURELLI, Mehmet I. 3717 Nobel Drive, 1329 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | |||
Former [2005/09] | 01 /
MOHANTY, Bibhu 4028 Mahaila Avenue, C San Diego, CA 92122 / US | ||
02 /
ESTEVES, Eduardo Rua Sao Benedito 873, Apt. 223 04735-002 Sao Paulo / BR | |||
03 /
GURELLI, Mehmet I. 3717 Nobel Drive, 1329 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | Representative(s) | Heselberger, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/49] | Heselberger, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/09] | Heselberger, Johannes Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03726647.5 | 06.05.2003 | [2005/09] | WO2003US14082 | Priority number, date | US20020140087 | 06.05.2002 Original published format: US 140087 | [2005/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03096150 | Date: | 20.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1509829 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1509829 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00, H04L1/18, H04L1/16 | [2013/26] | CPC: |
H04L1/0007 (EP,US);
H04L1/16 (EP,KR,US);
G01R31/08 (KR);
H04B7/212 (KR);
H04L1/0002 (EP,US);
H04L1/0025 (EP,US);
H04L1/1692 (EP,US);
H04L1/18 (KR);
H04L1/1809 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/09] | G06F1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/09] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERGÄNZUNG DER ARQ IN DER PHYSIKALISCHEN SCHICHT IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN DATENKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2005/09] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR AUGMENTING PHYSICAL LAYER ARQ IN A WIRELESS DATA COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2005/09] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT D'AUGMENTER UNE COUCHE PHYSIQUE ARQ DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION DE DONNEES SANS FIL | [2005/09] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/09] | 04.02.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07006365.6 / EP1804412 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.11.2006 | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.05.2003 | AT | 04.12.2013 | BE | 04.12.2013 | BG | 04.12.2013 | CY | 04.12.2013 | CZ | 04.12.2013 | DK | 04.12.2013 | EE | 04.12.2013 | ES | 04.12.2013 | FI | 04.12.2013 | IT | 04.12.2013 | MC | 04.12.2013 | NL | 04.12.2013 | RO | 04.12.2013 | SE | 04.12.2013 | SI | 04.12.2013 | SK | 04.12.2013 | TR | 04.12.2013 | GR | 05.03.2014 | PT | 04.04.2014 | IE | 06.05.2014 | LU | 06.05.2014 | CH | 31.05.2014 | LI | 31.05.2014 | FR | 02.06.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 06.05.2003 | |
AT | 04.12.2013 | ||
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
BG | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.03.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
IE | 06.05.2014 | ||
LU | 06.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
FR | 02.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
BG | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.03.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
IE | 06.05.2014 | ||
LU | 06.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
FR | 02.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
BG | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
IE | 06.05.2014 | ||
LU | 06.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
FR | 02.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
IE | 06.05.2014 | ||
LU | 06.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
FR | 02.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
IE | 06.05.2014 | ||
LU | 06.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
IE | 06.05.2014 | ||
LU | 06.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
LU | 06.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
LU | 06.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
LU | 06.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/04] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
LU | 06.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 04.12.2013 | |
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2332343 (MOTOROLA LTD [GB]) [X] 1,3,4,7 * page 2, line 5 - line 13 * * page 5, line 21 - page 6, line 8 *; | [X]EP1024623 (NORTEL NETWORKS CORP [CA]) [X] 1,4,5 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 15 * * column 4, line 15 - line 39 * * column 5, line 28 - line 45 * * column 6, line 16 - line 47 *; | [A]US2001032325 (FONG MO-HAN [CA], et al) [A] 15-27 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 8 - page 2, paragraph 16 * * page 4, paragraph 45 - paragraph 50 ** page 5, line 58 - line 59 *; | [A]US6307867 (ROOBOL CHRISTIAAN [SE], et al) [A] 15-27 * abstract * * column 1, line 35 - line 42 * * column 2, line 60 - line 66 * * column 3, line 39 - line 52 * * column 6, line 1 - line 26 *; | [X]US6314101 (REZAIIFAR RAMIN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6 * column 2, line 14 - line 51 * * column 4, line 64 - line 65 * * column 6, line 46 - column 7, line 54 *; | [A]WO0201743 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 8-14 * abstract * * page 5, line 20 - page 9, line 20 *; | [E]WO03043218 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [E] 8,9,11,12 * page 1, line 20 - page 2, line 10 * * page 2, line 24 - page 3, line 5 * * page 5, line 23 - page 6, line 30 * * page 6, line 26 - line 31 * * page 7, line 30 - page 8, line 7 * * page 8, line 22 - line 27 * * page 9, line 10 - line 27 * * page 10, line 25 - line 29 *; | [X] - ETSI, Universal Mobile Telecommunication System (UMTS);RLC Protocol Specification (3G TS 25.322 version 3.1.2 Release 1999), ETSI TS 125 322 V3.1.2, XX, XX, PAGE(S) 1-48, XP002168713 [X] 1,4,5 * section 8 section 9.4-9.6 section 9.7.2.-9.7.3. section 11.3 * |