EP1504635 - ELECTRONIC BALLAST FOR DISCHARGE LAMPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.09.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AURORA LIGHTING, INC. 620 Campbell Station Road, Suite 25 Knoxville, TN 37922 / US | [2005/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHLOUSH, Moshe 509 Echo Spring Road Knoxville, TN 37923 / US | 02 /
DULANEY, James, W. 8123 NW 120th Street Oklahoma City, OK 73162 / US | [2005/06] | Representative(s) | Pluckrose, Anthony William, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/06] | Pluckrose, Anthony William, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 03726779.6 | 12.05.2003 | [2005/06] | WO2003US14762 | Priority number, date | US20020145420 | 14.05.2002 Original published format: US 145420 | [2005/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03098978 | Date: | 27.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1504635 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.11.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/16 | [2005/06] | CPC: |
H05B41/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/06] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE BALLASTSCHALTUNG FÜR ENTLADUNGSLAMPEN | [2005/06] | English: | ELECTRONIC BALLAST FOR DISCHARGE LAMPS | [2005/06] | French: | BALLAST ELECTRONIQUE POUR LAMPES A DECHARGE | [2005/06] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2004 | Search fee paid | 28.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 14.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/44] | 13.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0377510 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 1,14 * column 4, line 11 - line 33; figure 6 *[A] 2-13,27; | [YA]US5363020 (CHEN NIAN [US], et al) [Y] 1,14,28 * column 5, line 44 - column 8, line 24; figures 1,2 * [A] 2-13,29-36; | [XAY]US5604411 (VENKITASUBRAHMANIAN SREERAMAN [US], et al) [X] 27 * column 4, line 41 - column 10, line 33; figure 1; claim 14 * * the whole document * [A] 1-14,29-38 [Y] 28 | International search | [A]US5900701 (GUHILOT HANSRAJ [IN], et al); | [AP]US6414448 (NOONE SEAN [IE], et al); | [AP]US6486616 (LIU GUANG [US], et al) |