EP1507666 - STAMP AND DEVICE FOR RECEIVING AN INKING PAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 18.03.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 03.08.2011 [2011/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trodat GmbH Linzer Strasse 156 4600 Wels / AT | [2005/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZINDL, Peter Nr. 33 A-4831 Obertraun / AT | 02 /
HAIBERGER, Manfred Jasminweg 4 A-4531 Piberbach / AT | [2005/08] | Representative(s) | Secklehner, Günter Rechtsanwalt Rosenauerweg 16 4580 Windischgarsten / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/08] | Secklehner, Günter Rosenauerweg 16 4580 Windischgarsten / AT | Application number, filing date | 03726987.5 | 14.05.2003 | [2005/08] | WO2003AT00138 | Priority number, date | AT20020000805 | 27.05.2002 Original published format: AT 8052002 | AT20030000057 | 17.01.2003 Original published format: AT 572003 | [2005/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03099572 | Date: | 04.12.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1507666 | Date: | 23.02.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1507666 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B41K1/40, B41K1/54 | [2005/08] | CPC: |
B41K1/40 (EP,US);
B41K1/54 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEMPEL UND AUFNAHMEEINRICHTUNG FÜR EIN STEMPELKISSEN | [2005/08] | English: | STAMP AND DEVICE FOR RECEIVING AN INKING PAD | [2005/08] | French: | TAMPON ET SYSTEME DE RECEPTION POUR TAMPON ENCREUR | [2005/08] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.11.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/08] | 29.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.07.2006
ADMISSIBLE COLOP Stempelerzeugung Skopek G.m.b.H & Co. KG Dr. Franz Armingstrasse 5 4600 Wels / AT Opponent's representative Beetz, Rainer Sonn & Partner Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [2006/34] | 17.08.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.02.2007 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.05.2009 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 27.05.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.12.2009 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 03.12.2009 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 31.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 02.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 12.12.2010 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2011/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.06.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 12.10.2005 | CZ | 12.10.2005 | EE | 12.10.2005 | FI | 12.10.2005 | GB | 12.10.2005 | IE | 12.10.2005 | NL | 12.10.2005 | RO | 12.10.2005 | SI | 12.10.2005 | SK | 12.10.2005 | TR | 12.10.2005 | BG | 12.01.2006 | DK | 12.01.2006 | GR | 12.01.2006 | SE | 12.01.2006 | ES | 23.01.2006 | PT | 13.03.2006 | HU | 13.04.2006 | LU | 14.05.2006 | BE | 31.05.2006 | MC | 31.05.2006 | CH | 31.05.2007 | LI | 31.05.2007 | AT | 14.05.2010 | IT | 14.05.2010 | FR | 31.05.2010 | DE | 01.12.2010 | [2011/31] |
Former [2011/22] | CY | 12.10.2005 | |
CZ | 12.10.2005 | ||
EE | 12.10.2005 | ||
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
GB | 12.10.2005 | ||
IE | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
RO | 12.10.2005 | ||
SI | 12.10.2005 | ||
SK | 12.10.2005 | ||
TR | 12.10.2005 | ||
BG | 12.01.2006 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
HU | 13.04.2006 | ||
LU | 14.05.2006 | ||
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
CH | 31.05.2007 | ||
LI | 31.05.2007 | ||
AT | 14.05.2010 | ||
IT | 14.05.2010 | ||
DE | 01.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | CY | 12.10.2005 | |
CZ | 12.10.2005 | ||
EE | 12.10.2005 | ||
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
GB | 12.10.2005 | ||
IE | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
RO | 12.10.2005 | ||
SI | 12.10.2005 | ||
SK | 12.10.2005 | ||
TR | 12.10.2005 | ||
BG | 12.01.2006 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
HU | 13.04.2006 | ||
LU | 14.05.2006 | ||
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
CH | 31.05.2007 | ||
LI | 31.05.2007 | ||
AT | 14.05.2010 | ||
IT | 14.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | CY | 12.10.2005 | |
CZ | 12.10.2005 | ||
EE | 12.10.2005 | ||
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
GB | 12.10.2005 | ||
IE | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
RO | 12.10.2005 | ||
SI | 12.10.2005 | ||
SK | 12.10.2005 | ||
TR | 12.10.2005 | ||
BG | 12.01.2006 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
HU | 13.04.2006 | ||
LU | 14.05.2006 | ||
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
CH | 31.05.2007 | ||
LI | 31.05.2007 | ||
AT | 14.05.2010 | ||
Former [2009/02] | CY | 12.10.2005 | |
CZ | 12.10.2005 | ||
EE | 12.10.2005 | ||
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
GB | 12.10.2005 | ||
IE | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
RO | 12.10.2005 | ||
SI | 12.10.2005 | ||
SK | 12.10.2005 | ||
TR | 12.10.2005 | ||
BG | 12.01.2006 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
HU | 13.04.2006 | ||
LU | 14.05.2006 | ||
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
CH | 31.05.2007 | ||
LI | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 12.10.2005 | |
EE | 12.10.2005 | ||
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
GB | 12.10.2005 | ||
IE | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
RO | 12.10.2005 | ||
SI | 12.10.2005 | ||
SK | 12.10.2005 | ||
TR | 12.10.2005 | ||
BG | 12.01.2006 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
HU | 13.04.2006 | ||
LU | 14.05.2006 | ||
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
CH | 31.05.2007 | ||
LI | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 12.10.2005 | |
EE | 12.10.2005 | ||
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
GB | 12.10.2005 | ||
IE | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
RO | 12.10.2005 | ||
SI | 12.10.2005 | ||
SK | 12.10.2005 | ||
BG | 12.01.2006 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
HU | 13.04.2006 | ||
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
CH | 31.05.2007 | ||
LI | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | CZ | 12.10.2005 | |
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
GB | 12.10.2005 | ||
IE | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
RO | 12.10.2005 | ||
SI | 12.10.2005 | ||
SK | 12.10.2005 | ||
BG | 12.01.2006 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
HU | 13.04.2006 | ||
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
CH | 31.05.2007 | ||
LI | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/45] | CZ | 12.10.2005 | |
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
GB | 12.10.2005 | ||
IE | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
RO | 12.10.2005 | ||
SI | 12.10.2005 | ||
SK | 12.10.2005 | ||
BG | 12.01.2006 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
HU | 13.04.2006 | ||
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/40] | CZ | 12.10.2005 | |
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
GB | 12.10.2005 | ||
IE | 12.10.2005 | ||
IT | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
SI | 12.10.2005 | ||
SK | 12.10.2005 | ||
BG | 12.01.2006 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
HU | 13.04.2006 | ||
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | CZ | 12.10.2005 | |
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
GB | 12.10.2005 | ||
IE | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
SI | 12.10.2005 | ||
SK | 12.10.2005 | ||
BG | 12.01.2006 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
HU | 13.04.2006 | ||
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | CZ | 12.10.2005 | |
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
GB | 12.10.2005 | ||
IE | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
SI | 12.10.2005 | ||
SK | 12.10.2005 | ||
BG | 12.01.2006 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
HU | 13.04.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | CZ | 12.10.2005 | |
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
IE | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
SI | 12.10.2005 | ||
SK | 12.10.2005 | ||
BG | 12.01.2006 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | CZ | 12.10.2005 | |
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
IE | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
SI | 12.10.2005 | ||
SK | 12.10.2005 | ||
BG | 12.01.2006 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | CZ | 12.10.2005 | |
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
SI | 12.10.2005 | ||
SK | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | CZ | 12.10.2005 | |
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
SI | 12.10.2005 | ||
SK | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
SI | 12.10.2005 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
SI | 12.10.2005 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
SI | 12.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | NL | 12.10.2005 | |
SI | 12.10.2005 | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO0183227 (TRODAT GMBH [AT], et al) [DA] 1,17,18 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO0183227 |