EP1625844 - THE COMPOSITION FOR EXTERNAL USE BY PERCUTANEOUS ADMINISTRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.10.2010 [2010/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lotus Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 11F, No. 200, Section 1, Fushing S. Road Da-an Chiu, Taipei City 106 / TW | [2006/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Busang 7Fl.-2, No.9, Sec.2, Chungshin Rd. Sanchung City, Taipei County 241 / CN | 02 /
LIN, Tongho 7Fl., No.53, Lane 30, Sec.4, Shinyi Rd. Da-an Chiu, Taipei City 106 / CN | [2006/07] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/07] | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03727132.7 | 16.05.2003 | [2006/07] | WO2003CN00358 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004100923 | Date: | 25.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1625844 | Date: | 15.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 25.11.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K31/015, A61K31/355, A61K31/375, A61K31/455, A61K31/525, A61K31/4415, A61P17/10 | [2006/07] | CPC: |
A61K8/31 (EP,US);
A61K8/67 (KR);
A61K8/673 (EP,US);
A61K8/676 (EP,US);
A61K8/678 (EP,US);
A61P17/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR EXTERNEN ANWENDUNG DURCH PERKUTANE VERABREICHUNG | [2006/07] | English: | THE COMPOSITION FOR EXTERNAL USE BY PERCUTANEOUS ADMINISTRATION | [2006/07] | French: | COMPOSITION A USAGE EXTERNE ADMINISTREE PAR VOIE PERCUTANEE | [2006/07] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2005 | Translation filed | 04.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2005 | Search fee paid | 04.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/07] | 02.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/40] | 19.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2240187 (ALBIN JEREB FRANZ DR) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [Y]DE3504695 (ROSHDY ISMAIL [DE]) [Y] 1-16 * claim - * * page 2, lines 30-34 * * examples 26,68 *; | [X]EP0330583 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1 * compositions A-D * * claim - *; | [Y]WO9508349 (FLOCKHART IAN [GB], et al) [Y] 1-16 * abstract * * page 7, lines 8-13 * * page 7, line 31 - page 8, line 1 * * claim - *; | [X]US6036946 (GREENE JAMES A [US]) [X] 1-16 * example - * * claim - * | International search | [A]US4938960 (ISMAIL ROSHDY [DE]); | [A]US5710177 (SAUERMANN GERHARD [DE], et al); | [A]CN1236634 (LI HUA [CN]) |