EP1604115 - INTEGRATED CENTRIFUGAL COMPRESSOR UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thermodyn 480, allée Gustave Eiffel 71200 Le Creusot / FR | [2016/23] |
Former [2016/19] | For all designated states Thermodyn Tour Framatome, 1 Place de la Coupole 92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states Thermodyn Tour Framatome, 1 Place de la Coupole 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LABOUBE, Pierre le Défend F-71200 Saint Sernin-Du-Bois / FR | 02 /
PUGNET, Jean-Marc 12, avenue Charles de Gaulle F-71200 Le Creusot / FR | 03 /
FRIEZ, Patrick 77C, rue du docteur Rebillard F-71200 Le Creusot / FR | [2005/50] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [2016/19] |
Former [2008/22] | Casalonga, Axel Bureau Casalonga & Josse Bayerstrasse 71/73 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/50] | Casalonga, Axel Bureau D.A. Casalonga - Josse, Paul-Heyse-Strasse 33 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03727579.9 | 10.03.2003 | [2005/50] | WO2003FR00768 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004083644 | Date: | 30.09.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1604115 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1604115 | Date: | 11.05.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/19] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1604115 | Date: | 13.07.2016 | [2016/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F04D17/12, F04D29/04, F04D25/06, F04D25/02 | [2005/50] | CPC: |
F04D29/058 (EP,US);
F04D17/125 (EP,NO,US);
F04D25/022 (EP,NO,US);
F04D25/0606 (EP,NO,US);
F04D29/054 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/19] |
Former [2005/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | GRUPPE VON INTEGRIERTEN ZENTRIFUGALKOMPRESSOREN | [2005/50] | English: | INTEGRATED CENTRIFUGAL COMPRESSOR UNIT | [2005/50] | French: | GROUPE COMPRESSEUR CENTRIFUGE | [2005/50] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 16.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.12.2010 | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 10.10.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.11.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 11.05.2016 | FI | 11.05.2016 | MC | 11.05.2016 | SE | 11.05.2016 | GR | 12.08.2016 | PT | 12.09.2016 | [2018/01] |
Former [2017/07] | DK | 11.05.2016 | |
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 11.05.2016 | |
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 11.05.2016 | |
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 11.05.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB282113 (RATEAU SOC) [X] 1,2 * page 1, lines 70-77; figure 1 *; | [A]GB1068004 (HISPANO SUIZA SA) [A] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [XY]EP0301285 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4-9 * column 6, line 1 - column 8, line 18; figures 1,2 * [Y] 2,3; | [Y]US4969803 (TURANSKYJ LUBOMYR [DE]) [Y] 2,3 * figures 1,1A,2 *; | [X]WO9723731 (COMOTI NATIONAL RESEARCH & DES [RO], et al) [X] 1 * page 2, line 32 - page 3, line 11; figure 1 *; | [A]US2002037772 (FISCH KLEMENS [CH], et al) [A] 1,5-9* the whole document *; | [X]US6464469 (GROB DENIS [CH], et al) [X] 1-3,5-9 * column 5, line 34 - column 6, line 5; figures 1-3 * |