EP1506605 - CONTACT-LESS POWER TRANSFER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.07.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Access Business Group International LLC 7575 Fulton Street East Ada, Michigan 49355 / US | [2009/35] |
Former [2008/37] | For all designated states Amway (Europe) Limited St Annes House Caldecotte Lake Drive Caldecotte Business Park Caldecotte Milton Keynes MK7 8JU / GB | ||
Former [2008/36] | For all designated states Splashpower Limited 5th Floor Exchange House 446 Midsummer Boulevard Central Milton Keyes Buckinghamshire MK9 2EA / GB | ||
Former [2005/07] | For all designated states Splashplower Limited The Jeffrey's Building, Cowley Road Cambridge CB4 0WS / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHENG, Lily Ka Lay Flat 10, Citygate, Woodhead Drive Cambridge CB4 1YL / GB | 02 /
HAY, James Westwood 28 College Fields, Woodhead Drive Cambridge CB4 1YZ / GB | 03 /
BEART, Pilgrim Giles William, 35 Royston Road Harston Cambridge CB2 5NH / GB | [2005/07] | Representative(s) | Lewin, David Nicholas, et al Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/21] | Lewin, David Nicholas, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | ||
Former [2009/35] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | ||
Former [2005/07] | Hitching, Peter Matthew Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 03727657.3 | 13.05.2003 | [2005/07] | WO2003GB02030 | Priority number, date | GB20020010886 | 13.05.2002 Original published format: GB 0210886 | GB20020013024 | 07.06.2002 Original published format: GB 0213024 | GB20020025006 | 28.10.2002 Original published format: GB 0225006 | GB20020028425 | 06.12.2002 Original published format: GB 0228425 | US20020326571 | 20.12.2002 Original published format: US 326571 | [2005/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03096512 | Date: | 20.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1506605 | Date: | 16.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00 | [2005/07] | CPC: |
H01F5/003 (EP,KR,US);
H02J50/12 (KR);
H01F27/25 (EP,KR);
H01F27/2804 (EP,KR);
H01F3/02 (EP,KR);
H01F38/14 (EP,KR);
H01F41/0226 (EP,KR);
H01F41/0233 (EP,KR);
H02J50/005 (EP,US);
H02J50/10 (EP,US);
H02J50/40 (KR);
H02J50/70 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BERÜHRUNGSLOSE LEISTUNGSÜBERTRAGUNG | [2005/07] | English: | CONTACT-LESS POWER TRANSFER | [2005/07] | French: | AMELIORATIONS RELATIVES AU TRANSFERT DE PUISSANCE SANS CONTACT | [2005/07] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/07] | 28.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/36] | 20.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.11.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2015 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DY]US5519262 (WOOD MARK B [US]) [DY] 4-7,29-32,47-50 * abstract *; | [XY]US6100663 (BOYS JOHN TALBOT [NZ], et al) [X] 1-3,8-10,14-28,33-36,39-46,51-53,56-62,67,68,70,71 * column 6, line 4 - column 7, line 62; figures 1,2 * [Y] 4-7,29-32,47-50; | [DX]US6208115 (BINDER YEHUDA [IL]) [DX] 56,62,65,66* the whole document * |