EP1516405 - CHARGER FOR RECHARGEABLE BATTERIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.06.2007 [2007/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/12] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN BEEK, Johann, R., G., C., M. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
NOTTEN, Petrus, H., L. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2005/12] | Representative(s) | Rolfes, Johannes Gerardus Albertus Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/12] | Rolfes, Johannes Gerardus Albertus Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 03727837.1 | 27.05.2003 | [2005/12] | WO2003IB02310 | Priority number, date | EP20020077383 | 14.06.2002 Original published format: EP 02077383 | [2005/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03107505 | Date: | 24.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1516405 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00 | [2005/12] | CPC: |
B60L53/14 (EP,US);
H02J7/04 (KR);
B60L3/0046 (US);
B60L58/13 (EP,US);
H02J7/0071 (EP,US);
H02M3/00 (EP,KR,US);
H02J7/00714 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
Y02T10/7072 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LADER FÜR WIEDERAUFLADBARE BATTERIEN | [2005/12] | English: | CHARGER FOR RECHARGEABLE BATTERIES | [2005/12] | French: | CHARGEUR POUR BATTERIES RECHARGEABLES | [2005/12] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/12] | 27.04.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5115182 (EHMKE EDWARD L [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * column 6, line 51 - line 58 * * column 7, line 54 - line 58 *; | [A]US5410238 (ISHIZUKA TAKAHITO [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 3, line 64 - line 66 * * column 4, line 13 - line 27 *; | [A]US5541496 (SIMMONDS STEWART N [CA]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 11, line 33 - line 60 * * column 3, line 64 - line 66 ** column 4, line 13 - line 27 *; | [X]US5710506 (BROELL FREDERICK GAUDENZ [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * |