EP1507090 - ROLLING PART AND POWER TRANSMISSION PART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.04.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTN Corporation 3-17, Kyomachibori 1-chome, Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0003 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/07] | For all designated states NTN CORPORATION 3-17, Kyomachibori 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 550-0003 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUBARA, Yukio, c/o NTN Corporation 3066, Aza Oyumid, Oaza Higashikata Kuwana-shi, Mie 511-0811 / JP | 02 /
MAEDA, Kikuo, c/o NTN Corporation 3066, Aza Oyumid, Oaza Higashikata Kuwana-shi, Mie 511-0811 / JP | [2005/17] |
Former [2005/07] | 01 /
FUJII, Yukio, c/o NTN Corporation 3066, Aza Oyumid, Oaza Higashikata Kuwana-shi, Mie 511-0811 / JP | ||
02 /
MAEDA, Kikuo, c/o NTN Corporation 3066, Aza Oyumid, Oaza Higashikata Kuwana-shi, Mie 511-0811 / JP | Representative(s) | Grosse, Wolfgang, et al Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Grosse, Wolfgang, et al Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/11] | Grosse, Wolfgang, et al Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/07] | GROSSE BOCKHORNI SCHUMACHER Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Forstenrieder Allee 59 81476 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03728107.8 | 19.05.2003 | [2005/07] | WO2003JP06237 | Priority number, date | JP20020149428 | 23.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002149428 | [2005/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03100277 | Date: | 04.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1507090 | Date: | 16.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/07] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1507090 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | [2005/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16C33/32, C21D1/18, C22C38/00, B60B35/14 | [2005/07] | CPC: |
C22C38/18 (EP,US);
B60B27/00 (EP,US);
C22C38/02 (EP,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,US);
F16C33/30 (EP,US);
F16C33/32 (EP,US);
F16C33/62 (EP,US);
C21D1/10 (EP,US);
F16C2326/02 (EP,US);
Y02P10/25 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROLLTEIL UND KRAFTÜBERTRAGUNGSTEIL | [2005/07] | English: | ROLLING PART AND POWER TRANSMISSION PART | [2005/07] | French: | ELEMENT DE ROULEMENT ET ORGANE DE TRANSMISSION DE PUISSANCE | [2005/07] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2004 | Translation filed | 11.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2004 | Search fee paid | 11.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 11.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/07] | 29.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPH02153044 (KUBOTA LTD); | [A]DE19928775 (NSK LTD [JP], et al); | [AP]JP2002363700 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD); | [AP]JP2003048404 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) |