EP1505888 - TWO-PLY BODY-SMOOTHING UNDERGARMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blakely, Sara T. 800-A East Morningside Drive Atlanta, GA 30324 / US | [2005/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLAKELY, Sara, T. 800-A East Morningside Drive Atlanta, GA 30324 / US | 02 /
DUCKHAM, Jadideah 3107-G Colonial Way Atlanta, GA 30341 / US | [2005/07] | Representative(s) | Kinsler, Maureen Catherine, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Kinsler, Maureen Catherine, et al Marks & Clerk 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | ||
Former [2005/07] | Kinsler, Maureen Catherine, et al Marks & Clerk Scotland 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 03728366.0 | 11.04.2003 | [2005/07] | WO2003US11045 | Priority number, date | US20020126570 | 19.04.2002 Original published format: US 126570 | [2005/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03088773 | Date: | 30.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1505888 | Date: | 16.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1505888 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A41B11/14, A41C1/00 | [2005/07] | CPC: |
D04B1/243 (EP,US);
A41B11/005 (EP,US);
A41B11/14 (EP,US);
A41C1/003 (EP,US);
A41B2400/38 (EP,US);
D10B2403/023 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZWEILAGIGE UNTERWÄSCHE MIT SCHLANKMACHENDER WIRKUNG | [2005/07] | English: | TWO-PLY BODY-SMOOTHING UNDERGARMENT | [2005/07] | French: | SOUS-VETEMENT GAINANT REPLIE EN DEUX | [2005/07] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/07] | 08.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.10.2007 | BE | 10.10.2007 | CH | 10.10.2007 | CY | 10.10.2007 | CZ | 10.10.2007 | DK | 10.10.2007 | EE | 10.10.2007 | FI | 10.10.2007 | LI | 10.10.2007 | NL | 10.10.2007 | RO | 10.10.2007 | SI | 10.10.2007 | SK | 10.10.2007 | TR | 10.10.2007 | BG | 10.01.2008 | SE | 10.01.2008 | GR | 11.01.2008 | ES | 21.01.2008 | PT | 10.03.2008 | HU | 11.04.2008 | IE | 11.04.2008 | LU | 11.04.2008 | MC | 30.04.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/34] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
BE | 10.10.2007 | ||
CH | 10.10.2007 | ||
CY | 10.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
EE | 10.10.2007 | ||
FI | 10.10.2007 | ||
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
RO | 10.10.2007 | ||
SI | 10.10.2007 | ||
SK | 10.10.2007 | ||
BG | 10.01.2008 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
GR | 11.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
HU | 11.04.2008 | ||
IE | 11.04.2008 | ||
LU | 11.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
BE | 10.10.2007 | ||
CH | 10.10.2007 | ||
CY | 10.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
EE | 10.10.2007 | ||
FI | 10.10.2007 | ||
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
RO | 10.10.2007 | ||
SI | 10.10.2007 | ||
SK | 10.10.2007 | ||
BG | 10.01.2008 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
GR | 11.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
IE | 11.04.2008 | ||
LU | 11.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
BE | 10.10.2007 | ||
CH | 10.10.2007 | ||
CY | 10.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
EE | 10.10.2007 | ||
FI | 10.10.2007 | ||
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
RO | 10.10.2007 | ||
SI | 10.10.2007 | ||
SK | 10.10.2007 | ||
BG | 10.01.2008 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
GR | 11.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
IE | 11.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
BE | 10.10.2007 | ||
CH | 10.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
EE | 10.10.2007 | ||
FI | 10.10.2007 | ||
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
RO | 10.10.2007 | ||
SI | 10.10.2007 | ||
SK | 10.10.2007 | ||
BG | 10.01.2008 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
GR | 11.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
IE | 11.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
BE | 10.10.2007 | ||
CH | 10.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
EE | 10.10.2007 | ||
FI | 10.10.2007 | ||
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
RO | 10.10.2007 | ||
SK | 10.10.2007 | ||
BG | 10.01.2008 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
GR | 11.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
IE | 11.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
BE | 10.10.2007 | ||
CH | 10.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
EE | 10.10.2007 | ||
FI | 10.10.2007 | ||
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
RO | 10.10.2007 | ||
SK | 10.10.2007 | ||
BG | 10.01.2008 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
GR | 11.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/51] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
BE | 10.10.2007 | ||
CH | 10.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
RO | 10.10.2007 | ||
SK | 10.10.2007 | ||
BG | 10.01.2008 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
BE | 10.10.2007 | ||
CH | 10.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
RO | 10.10.2007 | ||
SK | 10.10.2007 | ||
BG | 10.01.2008 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
CH | 10.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
BG | 10.01.2008 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
CH | 10.10.2007 | ||
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
BG | 10.01.2008 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CH | 10.10.2007 | |
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
BG | 10.01.2008 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH1060706 ; | [A]CH360360 (FORTUNA FOUNDATIONS INC [US]) [A] 1,14,18 * page 1, line 3 - line 10 * * page 1, line 35 - line 38 * * page 1, line 50 *; | [X]GB1320047 (PRETTY POLLY LTD) [X] 1-5,12-14,16,20,21,23,24 * page 1, line 12 * * page 1, line 19 - line 35 * * page 1, line 65 - line 67 * * page 1, line 95 - page 2, line 5 * * page 2, line 50 - line 63; figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]FR2184543 (BERTHEAS MICHEL [FR]) [A] 1,6-11,18,19 * page 1, line 10 - line 30 * * page 2, line 17 *; | [A]FR2744339 (NATAF STEEVE [FR]) [A] 1,14,18 * page 1, line 11 - line 13 * * page 1, line 18 * * page 1, line 21 - line 22 * * page 2, line 10 - line 12 * * page 2, line 23 - line 30; claims 1,2 *; | [A]FR2785176 (COGNON MORIN [FR]) [A] 1,9-11,14,18,19 * page 1, line 6 - line 8 * * page 1, line 35 - page 2, line 1 * * page 3, line 6 * * page 4, line 10 - line 12 * * page 4, line 17 - line 24 * * page 6, line 15 - line 17 * * page 10, line 11 - line 13; figures 1,2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980630), vol. 1998, no. 08, & JP10060706 A 19980303 (TAMURA:KK) [A] 1,14,18 * abstract * |