EP1522191 - SUPPORTING COMMON INTERACTIVE TELEVISION FUNCTIONALITY THROUGH PRESENTATION ENGINE SYNTAX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.06.2014 [2014/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Opentv, Inc. 275 Sacramento Street San Francisco, CA 94111 / US | [2013/29] |
Former [2005/15] | For all designated states Opentv, Inc. 275 Sacramento Street San Francisco, CA 94111 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DELPUCH, Alain / US | 02 /
WHITLEDGE, James / US | 03 /
MENAND, Jean-Rene / US | 04 /
BARBIER, Emmanuel / US | 05 /
HAUSMAN, Kevin / US | 06 /
HENSGEN, Debra / US | 07 /
SU, Dongmin / US | [2013/29] |
Former [2005/15] | 01 /
DELPUCH, Alain / US | ||
02 /
WHITLEDGE, James / US | |||
03 /
MENAND, Jean-Rene / US | |||
04 /
BARBIER, Emmanuel / US | |||
05 /
HAUSMAN, Kevin / US | |||
06 /
HENSGEN, Debra / US | |||
07 /
SU, Dongmin / US | Representative(s) | Wenger, Joel-Théophile Leman Consulting S.A. Chemin de Précossy 31 1260 Nyon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | Wenger, Joel-Théophile Leman Consulting S.A. Chemin de Précossy 31 1260 Nyon / CH | ||
Former [2009/49] | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol W.P.Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | ||
Former [2005/15] | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol W.P. THOMPSON & CO. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03728451.0 | 21.04.2003 | [2005/15] | WO2003US12241 | Priority number, date | US20020373883P | 19.04.2002 Original published format: US 373883 P | [2005/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03090468 | Date: | 30.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1522191 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1522191 | Date: | 17.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/8543, H04N21/6543, H04N21/81, H04N21/236 | [2013/13] | CPC: |
H04N21/234336 (EP,US);
H04N21/2358 (EP,US);
H04N21/23617 (EP,US);
H04N21/4516 (EP,US);
H04N21/454 (EP,US);
H04N21/654 (EP,US);
H04N21/6543 (EP,US);
H04N21/8193 (EP,US);
H04N21/8543 (EP,US);
H04N7/17318 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/15] | H04N7/173, H04N5/445 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2013/29] |
Former [2005/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | UNTERSTÜTZUNG VON GEMEINSAMER INTERAKTIVER FERNSEHFUNKTIONALITÄT DURCH PRÄSENTATIONS-ENGINE-SYNTAX | [2005/15] | English: | SUPPORTING COMMON INTERACTIVE TELEVISION FUNCTIONALITY THROUGH PRESENTATION ENGINE SYNTAX | [2005/15] | French: | SUPPORT DE FONCTIONNALITE DE TELEVISION INTERACTIVE COMMUNE AU MOYEN D'UNE SYNTAXE DE MOTEUR DE PRESENTATION | [2005/15] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/15] | 23.12.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.03.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 28.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/26] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 06.01.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 06.01.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.01.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]GB2332803 (DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1,13,22,23 * the whole document * [A] 2-12,14-21; | [YA]US6184878 (ALONSO RAFAEL [US], et al) [Y] 1,13,22,23 * the whole document * [A] 2-12,14-21; | [A]EP0837599 (NEXTLEVEL SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-23 * page 4, line 51 - page 5, line 44 *; | [A]WO0217639 (INTELLOCITY USA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * page 4, line 16 - page 11, line 10 * | Examination | US5925100 | US2001001160 | WO0126369 | US6269403 | by applicant | US5925100 | US2001001160 | WO0126369 |