EP1504618 - POINT TO MULTI-POINT SERVICES USING HIGH SPEED SHARED CHANNELS IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.10.2014 [2014/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital Technology Corporation 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | [2013/15] |
Former [2005/06] | For all designated states INTERDIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 527 Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TERRY, Stephen, E. 15 Summit Avenue Northport, NY 11768 / US | [2005/06] | Representative(s) | Pierrou, Mattias Awapatent AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/06] | Pierrou, Mattias Awapatent AB, P.O. Box 45 086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 03728583.0 | 30.04.2003 | [2005/06] | WO2003US13171 | Priority number, date | US20020377036P | 01.05.2002 Original published format: US 377036 P | [2005/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03094554 | Date: | 13.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1504618 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.11.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/22 | [2005/06] | CPC: |
H04L1/20 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/30 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0003 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0026 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0041 (US);
H04L1/1819 (EP,KR,US);
H04L12/2861 (KR);
H04W28/04 (KR);
H04W4/06 (EP,US);
H04W4/08 (EP,US);
H04W48/12 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/04 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PUNKT-ZU-MEHRPUNKT-DIENSTE UNTER VERWENDUNG SCHNELLER GEMEINSAM BENUTZTER KANÄLE IN DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEMEN | [2005/06] | English: | POINT TO MULTI-POINT SERVICES USING HIGH SPEED SHARED CHANNELS IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS | [2005/06] | French: | SERVICES POINT A MULTIPOINT FAISANT APPEL A DES CANAUX PARTAGES A VITESSE ELEVEE | [2005/06] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2004 | Search fee paid | 29.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 17.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/43] | 16.09.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.09.2014 | 24.09.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | EP14155353.7 / EP2733990 | EP14155417.0 / EP2733991 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.02.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP1006740 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [I] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0023] - [0040] - [0060] *; | [A] - SIEMENS, "Discussion of requirements of a MBMS transport channel", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-020732_DISCUSSION_OF_REQUIRMENTS_OF_A_MBMS_TRANSPORT_C HANNEL, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20020404), vol. RAN WG2, no. Kobe, Japan; 20020404, XP050120358 [A] 1-4 * pages 1-3 * | [A] - MAGNUS FRODIGH ET AL, "Future-Generation Wireless Networks", IEEE PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE COMMUNICATIONS SOCIETY, US, (20011001), vol. 8, no. 5, ISSN 1070-9916, pages 10 - 17, XP011092127 [A] 1-4 * page 14, column l, lines 31-39 * * page 14, column r, lines 44-47 * | [A] - KOHNO R ED - INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, "Evolution and demands of soc in ITS and mobile communication systems", PROCEEDINGS OF ISSM 2000. THE 9TH. INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON SEMICONDUCTOR MANUFACTURING. TOKYO, JAPAN, SEPT. 26 - 28, 2000; [IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON SEMICONDUCTOR MANUFACTURING], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US LNKD- DOI:10.1109/ISSM.2000.993605, (20000926), vol. CONF. 9, ISBN 978-0-7803-7392-1, pages 6 - 10, XP010587083 [A] 1-4 * page 7, column r * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISSM.2000.993605 | [A] - EYCEOZ T ET AL, "Adaptive prediction, tracking and power adjustment for frequency non-selective fast fading channels", COMMUNICATION THEORY MINI-CONFERENCE, 1999 VANCOUVER, BC, CANADA 6-10 JUNE 1999, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19990606), ISBN 978-0-7803-5653-5, pages 1 - 5, XP010351131 [A] 1-4 * page 3, column r * * page 5, paragraph 5 * | International search | [AP]US2002136193 (CHANG JIN-WEON [KR], et al); | [AP]US6529740 (GANUCHEAU JR CHARLES JOSEPH [US], et al); | [AE]US2003095605 (DAS ARNAB [US], et al); | [AE]US2003123382 (WANG YAN [US], et al) | Examination | - LG ELECTRONICS INC, "Use of DSCH for MBMS Multicast Mode", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-022573_MBMS DSCH, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20020930), vol. RAN WG2, no. China; 20020930, XP050122051 | by applicant | EP1006740 | - R. KOHNO, "Evolution and Demands of SoC in ITS and Mobile Communication Systems", THE NINTH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON SEMICONDUCTOR MANUFACTURING |