Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005051234 | Global Dossier | 10.11.2005 | A3 | WO2005051234 | 09.06.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US54336804 | 09.02.2004 | US71454903 | 13.11.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005002625 | Global Dossier | 21.04.2005 | A3 | WO2005002625 | 13.01.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | US57530704 | 28.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005000268 | Global Dossier | 18.08.2005 | A3 | WO2005000268 | 06.01.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | US50194703 | 11.09.2003 | US57530704 | 28.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004066983 | Global Dossier | 18.11.2004 | A3 | WO2004066983 | 12.08.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US44249903 | 24.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004066980 | Global Dossier | 16.09.2004 | A3 | WO2004066980 | 12.08.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US44249903 | 24.01.2003 | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | US50197503 | 11.09.2003 | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004066979 | Global Dossier | 16.09.2004 | A3 | WO2004066979 | 12.08.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US44249903 | 24.01.2003 | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | US50197403 | 11.09.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004060878 | Global Dossier | 27.01.2005 | A3 | WO2004060878 | 22.07.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US43757602 | 31.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004043435 | Global Dossier | 08.07.2004 | A3 | WO2004043435 | 27.05.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US42594302 | 13.11.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03094888 | Global Dossier | 13.05.2004 | A9 | WO03094888 | 20.11.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37797402 | 07.05.2002 | US45234803 | 06.03.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0180825 | Global Dossier | 20.06.2002 | A3 | WO0180825 | 01.11.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US55820700 | 26.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019201324 | Global Dossier | 04.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816234449 | 27.12.2018 | US37797402 | 07.05.2002 | US45234803 | 06.03.2003 | US42821403 | 02.05.2003 | US89469407 | 20.08.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9849085 | Global Dossier | 26.12.2017 | B2 | US2016038412 | 11.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US68995610 | 19.01.2010 | US55820700 | 26.04.2000 | US9687702 | 14.03.2002 | US201514919962 | 22.10.2015 | US201314057847 | 18.10.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9566336 | Global Dossier | 14.02.2017 | B2 | US2014336278 | 13.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213612076 | 12.09.2012 | US201414444338 | 28.07.2014 | US87061610 | 27.08.2010 | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | US87775804 | 25.06.2004 | US57530704 | 28.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9192579 | Global Dossier | 24.11.2015 | B2 | US2014107594 | 17.04.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US68995610 | 19.01.2010 | US55820700 | 26.04.2000 | US9687702 | 14.03.2002 | US201314057847 | 18.10.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013101656 | Global Dossier | 25.04.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213612076 | 12.09.2012 | US87061610 | 27.08.2010 | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | US87775804 | 25.06.2004 | US57530704 | 28.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011165242 | Global Dossier | 07.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US87061610 | 27.08.2010 | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | US87775804 | 25.06.2004 | US57530704 | 28.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8574659 | Global Dossier | 05.11.2013 | B2 | US2010119694 | 13.05.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US8114205 | 15.03.2005 | US55820700 | 26.04.2000 | US68813210 | 15.01.2010 | US9687702 | 14.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8574613 | Global Dossier | 05.11.2013 | B2 | US2010119580 | 13.05.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US68995610 | 19.01.2010 | US55820700 | 26.04.2000 | US9687702 | 14.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010080830 | Global Dossier | 01.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US55820700 | 26.04.2000 | US71333603 | 13.11.2003 | US9687702 | 14.03.2002 | US63024609 | 03.12.2009 | US42594302 | 13.11.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009060968 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US20974608 | 12.09.2008 | US43756702 | 31.12.2002 | US75032603 | 31.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008063687 | Global Dossier | 13.03.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37797402 | 07.05.2002 | US45234803 | 06.03.2003 | US42821403 | 02.05.2003 | US71454903 | 13.11.2003 | US42594302 | 13.11.2002 | US89469407 | 20.08.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005186279 | Global Dossier | 25.08.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US8114205 | 15.03.2005 | US55820700 | 26.04.2000 | US9687702 | 14.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005048123 | Global Dossier | 03.03.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | US87775804 | 25.06.2004 | US57530704 | 28.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8815284 | Global Dossier | 26.08.2014 | B2 | US2005025834 | 03.02.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US87776104 | 25.06.2004 | US50194703 | 11.09.2003 | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | US57530704 | 28.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004208910 | Global Dossier | 21.10.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US44249903 | 24.01.2003 | US55820700 | 26.04.2000 | US37797402 | 07.05.2002 | US9687702 | 14.03.2002 | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | US45234803 | 06.03.2003 | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | US42821403 | 02.05.2003 | US76243904 | 22.01.2004 | US50197403 | 11.09.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7439249 | Global Dossier | 21.10.2008 | B2 | US2004186116 | 23.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US43756702 | 31.12.2002 | US0341661 | 31.12.2003 | US75032603 | 31.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8871241 | Global Dossier | 28.10.2014 | B2 | US2004176341 | 09.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37797402 | 07.05.2002 | US45234803 | 06.03.2003 | US43757602 | 31.12.2002 | US42821403 | 02.05.2003 | US71454903 | 13.11.2003 | US42594302 | 13.11.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004175426 | Global Dossier | 09.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US44249903 | 24.01.2003 | US76369604 | 23.01.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004175410 | Global Dossier | 09.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US44249903 | 24.01.2003 | US55820700 | 26.04.2000 | US37797402 | 07.05.2002 | US9687702 | 14.03.2002 | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | US45234803 | 06.03.2003 | US50197503 | 11.09.2003 | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | US42821403 | 02.05.2003 | US76242104 | 22.01.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004115268 | Global Dossier | 17.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US55820700 | 26.04.2000 | US71333603 | 13.11.2003 | US9687702 | 14.03.2002 | US42594302 | 13.11.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004009222 | Global Dossier | 15.01.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37797402 | 07.05.2002 | US45234803 | 06.03.2003 | US42821403 | 02.05.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10300114 | Global Dossier | 28.05.2019 | B2 | US2014363482 | 11.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US87776104 | 25.06.2004 | US201414320940 | 01.07.2014 | US50194703 | 11.09.2003 | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | US57530704 | 28.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20100120243 | Global Dossier | 12.11.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US37797402 | 07.05.2002 | US45234803 | 06.03.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20050123091 | Global Dossier | 29.12.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US44249903 | 24.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20050118161 | Global Dossier | 15.12.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US44249903 | 24.01.2003 | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | US50197403 | 11.09.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20050108345 | Global Dossier | 16.11.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US44249903 | 24.01.2003 | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | US50197503 | 11.09.2003 | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101019299B | Global Dossier | 07.03.2011 | B1 | KR20050007377 | 17.01.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US0313733 | 01.05.2003 | US37797402 | 07.05.2002 | US45234803 | 06.03.2003 | US43757602 | 31.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100854541B | Global Dossier | 26.08.2008 | B1 | KR20030009447 | 29.01.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US55820700 | 26.04.2000 | US0112700 | 19.04.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2014205713 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | US50194703 | 11.09.2003 | US57530704 | 28.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5918195B | Global Dossier | 18.05.2016 | B2 | JP2014040479 | 06.03.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US54336804 | 09.02.2004 | US71454903 | 13.11.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5526114B | Global Dossier | 18.06.2014 | B2 | JP2012072180 | 12.04.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US54336804 | 09.02.2004 | US71454903 | 13.11.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2011093944 | Global Dossier | 12.05.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | US50194703 | 11.09.2003 | US57530704 | 28.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5628467B | Global Dossier | 19.11.2014 | B2 | JP2007537977 | 27.12.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US50194703 | 11.09.2003 | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | WO2004US20547 | 25.06.2004 | US57530704 | 28.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5229768B | Global Dossier | 03.07.2013 | B2 | JP2007524628 | 30.08.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | WO2004US20369 | 25.06.2004 | US57530704 | 28.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5661226B | Global Dossier | 28.01.2015 | B2 | JP2007512248 | 17.05.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004US35430 | 26.10.2004 | US54336804 | 09.02.2004 | US71454903 | 13.11.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2006516621 | Global Dossier | 06.07.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US44249903 | 24.01.2003 | WO2004US01848 | 23.01.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2006516619 | Global Dossier | 06.07.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US44249903 | 24.01.2003 | WO2004US01719 | 23.01.2004 | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | US50197503 | 11.09.2003 | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2006516618 | Global Dossier | 06.07.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US44249903 | 24.01.2003 | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | WO2004US01718 | 23.01.2004 | US50197403 | 11.09.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4619795B | Global Dossier | 26.01.2011 | B2 | JP2006514658 | 11.05.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US0341661 | 31.12.2003 | US43757602 | 31.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2005532313 | Global Dossier | 27.10.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US0313733 | 01.05.2003 | US37797402 | 07.05.2002 | US45234803 | 06.03.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4705304B | Global Dossier | 22.06.2011 | B2 | JP2003530964 | 21.10.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US55820700 | 26.04.2000 | US0112700 | 19.04.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2233112 | Global Dossier | 14.05.2014 | B3 | EP2233112 | 20.11.2013 | B1 | EP2233112 | 02.03.2011 | A3 | EP2233112 | 29.09.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US54336804 | 09.02.2004 | US71454903 | 13.11.2003 | EP04796413 | 26.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2044959 | Global Dossier | 08.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | US57530704 | 28.05.2004 | EP04756068 | 25.06.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1982701 | Global Dossier | 15.07.2009 | A3 | EP1982701 | 22.10.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US55820700 | 26.04.2000 | EP01927200 | 19.04.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1696822 | Global Dossier | 17.03.2010 | B1 | EP1696822 | 06.09.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2004US35430 | 26.10.2004 | US54336804 | 09.02.2004 | US71454903 | 13.11.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1635875 | Global Dossier | 24.12.2008 | B8 | EP1635875 | 08.10.2008 | B1 | EP1635875 | 22.03.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | WO2004US20369 | 25.06.2004 | US57530704 | 28.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1635787 | Global Dossier | 14.12.2011 | B1 | EP1635787 | 22.03.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US50194703 | 11.09.2003 | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | WO2004US20547 | 25.06.2004 | US57530704 | 28.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1592411 | Global Dossier | 09.11.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US44249903 | 24.01.2003 | WO2004US01848 | 23.01.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1592408 | Global Dossier | 26.08.2009 | B1 | EP1592408 | 09.11.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US44249903 | 24.01.2003 | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | WO2004US01718 | 23.01.2004 | US50197403 | 11.09.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1592407 | Global Dossier | 16.12.2009 | B1 | EP1592407 | 09.11.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US44249903 | 24.01.2003 | WO2004US01719 | 23.01.2004 | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | US50197503 | 11.09.2003 | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1583747 | Global Dossier | 12.10.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US0341661 | 31.12.2003 | US43757602 | 31.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1276462 | Global Dossier | 24.09.2008 | B1 | EP1276462 | 22.01.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US55820700 | 26.04.2000 | US0112700 | 19.04.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5367501 | Global Dossier | 07.11.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US55820700 | 26.04.2000 | US0112700 | 19.04.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2008261114B | Global Dossier | 30.06.2011 | B2 | AU2008261114 | 15.01.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US55820700 | 26.04.2000 | AU2006202338 | 01.06.2006 | US0112700 | 19.04.2001 | AU2001253675 | 19.04.2001 | AU2008261114 | 18.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2006202338B | Global Dossier | 18.09.2008 | B2 | AU2006202338 | 22.06.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US55820700 | 26.04.2000 | AU2006202338 | 01.06.2006 | US0112700 | 19.04.2001 | AU2001253675 | 19.04.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2004292957C | Global Dossier | 28.04.2011 | C1 | AU2004292957B | 09.09.2010 | B2 | AU2004292957 | 09.06.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004US35430 | 26.10.2004 | US54336804 | 09.02.2004 | US71454903 | 13.11.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2004207523 | Global Dossier | 12.08.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US44249903 | 24.01.2003 | WO2004US01848 | 23.01.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2004207507B | Global Dossier | 19.11.2009 | B2 | AU2004207507 | 12.08.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US44249903 | 24.01.2003 | WO2004US01719 | 23.01.2004 | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | US50197503 | 11.09.2003 | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2004207506B | Global Dossier | 08.10.2009 | B2 | AU2004207506 | 12.08.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US44249903 | 24.01.2003 | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | WO2004US01718 | 23.01.2004 | US50197403 | 11.09.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003300114B | Global Dossier | 26.11.2009 | B9 | AU2003300114B | 23.07.2009 | B2 | AU2003300114 | 29.07.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0341661 | 31.12.2003 | US43757602 | 31.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003287666 | Global Dossier | 03.06.2004 | A8 | AU2003287666 | 03.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0336637 | 13.11.2003 | US42594302 | 13.11.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003234439 | Global Dossier | 11.11.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0313733 | 01.05.2003 | US37797402 | 07.05.2002 | US45234803 | 06.03.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2001253675B | Global Dossier | 02.03.2006 | B2 | Priority number | Date | US55820700 | 26.04.2000 | US0112700 | 19.04.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1503731 | Global Dossier | 09.02.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0313733 | 01.05.2003 | US37797402 | 07.05.2002 | US45234803 | 06.03.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR028372 | 07.05.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US55820700 | 26.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR039880 | 09.03.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37797402 | 07.05.2002 | US45234803 | 06.03.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR042917 | 06.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US44249903 | 24.01.2003 | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | US50197403 | 11.09.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR042920 | 06.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US44249903 | 24.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR043356 | 27.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US44249903 | 24.01.2003 | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | US50197503 | 11.09.2003 | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR044926 | 12.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | US57530704 | 28.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR047552 | 25.01.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | US50194703 | 11.09.2003 | US57530704 | 28.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE409023T | 15.10.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US55820700 | 26.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE410186T | 15.10.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | US57530704 | 28.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE440595T | 15.09.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US44249903 | 24.01.2003 | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | WO2004US01718 | 23.01.2004 | US50197403 | 11.09.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE451915T | 15.01.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US44249903 | 24.01.2003 | WO2004US01719 | 23.01.2004 | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | US50197503 | 11.09.2003 | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE460901T | 15.04.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004US35430 | 26.10.2004 | US54336804 | 09.02.2004 | US71454903 | 13.11.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE536861T | 15.12.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US50194703 | 11.09.2003 | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | WO2004US20547 | 25.06.2004 | US57530704 | 28.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0110243 | 07.01.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US55820700 | 26.04.2000 | US0112700 | 19.04.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0309844 | 15.02.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US0313733 | 01.05.2003 | US37797402 | 07.05.2002 | US45234803 | 06.03.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0406858 | 03.01.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US44249903 | 24.01.2003 | WO2004US01848 | 23.01.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0406879 | 22.12.2015 | B1 | BRPI0406879 | 03.01.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US44249903 | 24.01.2003 | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | WO2004US01718 | 23.01.2004 | US50197403 | 11.09.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0406880 | 03.01.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US44249903 | 24.01.2003 | WO2004US01719 | 23.01.2004 | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | US50197503 | 11.09.2003 | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2406277 | 11.06.2013 | C | CA2406277 | 01.11.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US55820700 | 26.04.2000 | US0112700 | 19.04.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2484632 | 11.12.2012 | C | CA2484632 | 20.11.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0313733 | 01.05.2003 | US37797402 | 07.05.2002 | US45234803 | 06.03.2003 | US43757602 | 31.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2511925 | 13.11.2012 | C | CA2511925 | 22.07.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0341661 | 31.12.2003 | US43757602 | 31.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2513751 | 10.01.2012 | C | CA2513751 | 12.08.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US44249903 | 24.01.2003 | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | WO2004US01718 | 23.01.2004 | US50197403 | 11.09.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2513752 | 03.01.2012 | C | CA2513752 | 12.08.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US44249903 | 24.01.2003 | WO2004US01719 | 23.01.2004 | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | US50197503 | 11.09.2003 | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2513884 | 12.08.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US44249903 | 24.01.2003 | WO2004US01848 | 23.01.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2530113 | 13.08.2013 | C | CA2530113 | 06.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50194703 | 11.09.2003 | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | WO2004US20547 | 25.06.2004 | US57530704 | 28.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2530136 | 16.10.2012 | C | CA2530136 | 13.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | WO2004US20369 | 25.06.2004 | US57530704 | 28.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2545650 | 18.08.2015 | C | CA2545650 | 09.06.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004US35430 | 26.10.2004 | US54336804 | 09.02.2004 | US71454903 | 13.11.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100594899C | 24.03.2010 | C | CN1756537 | 05.04.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US44249903 | 24.01.2003 | WO2004US01719 | 23.01.2004 | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | US50197503 | 11.09.2003 | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101396335 | 01.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US55820700 | 26.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101513386 | 26.08.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US55820700 | 26.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101862455 | 20.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | US57530704 | 28.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106176665 | 07.12.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US55820700 | 26.04.2000 | CN01811703 | 19.04.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1438873 | 27.08.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US55820700 | 26.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1658836 | 24.08.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US37797402 | 07.05.2002 | US45234803 | 06.03.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1741792 | 01.03.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US44249903 | 24.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1741793 | 01.03.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US44249903 | 24.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1842321B | 04.07.2012 | B | CN1842321 | 04.10.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US50194703 | 11.09.2003 | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | WO2004US20547 | 25.06.2004 | US57530704 | 28.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1863557B | 16.06.2010 | B | CN1863557 | 15.11.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | WO2004US20369 | 25.06.2004 | US57530704 | 28.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1901850B | 03.10.2012 | B | CN1901850 | 24.01.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004US35430 | 26.10.2004 | US54336804 | 09.02.2004 | US71454903 | 13.11.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1108665T | 09.04.2014 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US55820700 | 26.04.2000 | EP01927200 | 19.04.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1108685T | 09.04.2014 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | US57530704 | 28.05.2004 | EP04756068 | 25.06.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1114534T | 05.10.2016 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US54336804 | 09.02.2004 | US71454903 | 13.11.2003 | EP04796413 | 26.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1114947T | 14.12.2016 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP10156691 | 26.10.2004 | US54336804 | 09.02.2004 | US71454903 | 13.11.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60135907D1 | 06.11.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US55820700 | 26.04.2000 | US0112700 | 19.04.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602004016995D1 | 20.11.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | WO2004US20369 | 25.06.2004 | US57530704 | 28.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602004022776D1 | 08.10.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US44249903 | 24.01.2003 | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | WO2004US01718 | 23.01.2004 | US50197403 | 11.09.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602004024642D1 | 28.01.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US44249903 | 24.01.2003 | WO2004US01719 | 23.01.2004 | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | US50197503 | 11.09.2003 | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602004026106D1 | 29.04.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004US35430 | 26.10.2004 | US54336804 | 09.02.2004 | US71454903 | 13.11.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1276462T | 09.02.2009 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US55820700 | 26.04.2000 | US0112700 | 19.04.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1592407T | 19.04.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US44249903 | 24.01.2003 | WO2004US01719 | 23.01.2004 | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | US50197503 | 11.09.2003 | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1592408T | 04.01.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US44249903 | 24.01.2003 | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | WO2004US01718 | 23.01.2004 | US50197403 | 11.09.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1635787T | 26.03.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US50194703 | 11.09.2003 | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | WO2004US20547 | 25.06.2004 | US57530704 | 28.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1635875T | 12.01.2009 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | WO2004US20369 | 25.06.2004 | US57530704 | 28.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1696822T | 17.05.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2004US35430 | 26.10.2004 | US54336804 | 09.02.2004 | US71454903 | 13.11.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2233112T | 24.02.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US54336804 | 09.02.2004 | US71454903 | 13.11.2003 | EP04796413 | 26.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA004980 | 28.10.2004 | B1 | EA200201140 | 27.02.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US55820700 | 26.04.2000 | US0112700 | 19.04.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2315282T | 01.04.2009 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US55820700 | 26.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2315680T | 01.04.2009 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | US57530704 | 28.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2332720T | 11.02.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US44249903 | 24.01.2003 | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | US50197403 | 11.09.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2338420T | 07.05.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US44249903 | 24.01.2003 | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | US50197503 | 11.09.2003 | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2340389T | 02.06.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US54336804 | 09.02.2004 | US71454903 | 13.11.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2379466T | 26.04.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US50194703 | 11.09.2003 | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | WO2004US20547 | 25.06.2004 | US57530704 | 28.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2447816T | 25.06.2014 | T7 | ES2447816T | 13.03.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US54336804 | 09.02.2004 | US71454903 | 13.11.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR14C0042I | 27.06.2014 | I1 | Priority number | Date | US54336804 | 09.02.2004 | US71454903 | 13.11.2003 | EP04796413 | 26.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1053263 | 29.05.2009 | B | HK1053263 | 17.10.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US55820700 | 26.04.2000 | US0112700 | 19.04.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1148931 | 23.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US54336804 | 09.02.2004 | US71454903 | 13.11.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL152294 | 30.04.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US55820700 | 26.04.2000 | US0112700 | 19.04.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL175584 | 31.05.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004US35430 | 26.10.2004 | US54336804 | 09.02.2004 | US71454903 | 13.11.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN4939DELNP2012 | 25.09.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004US35430 | 26.10.2004 | US92587603 | 13.11.2003 | US54336804 | 09.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA02010442 | 06.09.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US55820700 | 26.04.2000 | US0112700 | 19.04.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA04011004 | 25.01.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US0313733 | 01.05.2003 | US37797402 | 07.05.2002 | US45234803 | 06.03.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA05007717 | 30.09.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US44249903 | 24.01.2003 | WO2004US01848 | 23.01.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA05007718 | 30.09.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US44249903 | 24.01.2003 | WO2004US01719 | 23.01.2004 | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | US50197503 | 11.09.2003 | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA05007719 | 30.09.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US44249903 | 24.01.2003 | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | WO2004US01718 | 23.01.2004 | US50197403 | 11.09.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA06005431 | 25.01.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004US35430 | 26.10.2004 | US54336804 | 09.02.2004 | US71454903 | 13.11.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20062362L | 13.08.2006 | L | Priority number | Date | WO2004US35430 | 26.10.2004 | US54336804 | 09.02.2004 | US71454903 | 13.11.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ522002 | 25.06.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US55820700 | 26.04.2000 | US0112700 | 19.04.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ531721 | 25.11.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US55820700 | 26.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ547619 | 26.06.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004US35430 | 26.10.2004 | US54336804 | 09.02.2004 | US71454903 | 13.11.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ575950 | 25.06.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US54336804 | 09.02.2004 | US71454903 | 13.11.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ581461 | 29.04.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US54336804 | 09.02.2004 | US71454903 | 13.11.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL1635875T | 31.03.2009 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | WO2004US20369 | 25.06.2004 | US57530704 | 28.05.2004 | EP04756068 | 25.06.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL1696822T | 31.08.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2004US35430 | 26.10.2004 | US54336804 | 09.02.2004 | US71454903 | 13.11.2003 | EP04796413 | 26.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2233112T | 28.11.2014 | T6 | PL2233112T | 30.05.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP10156691 | 26.10.2004 | US54336804 | 09.02.2004 | US71454903 | 13.11.2003 | EP04796413 | 26.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1276462E | 08.01.2009 | E | Priority number | Date | US55820700 | 26.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1635875E | 09.12.2008 | E | Priority number | Date | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | US57530704 | 28.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1696822E | 28.04.2010 | E | Priority number | Date | US54336804 | 09.02.2004 | US71454903 | 13.11.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2233112E | 27.02.2014 | E | Priority number | Date | US54336804 | 09.02.2004 | US71454903 | 13.11.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI1276462T | 28.02.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US55820700 | 26.04.2000 | EP01927200 | 19.04.2001 | US0112700 | 19.04.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI1592407T | 30.04.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US44249903 | 24.01.2003 | EP04704793 | 23.01.2004 | WO2004US01719 | 23.01.2004 | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | US50197503 | 11.09.2003 | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI1592408T | 29.01.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US44249903 | 24.01.2003 | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | WO2004US01718 | 23.01.2004 | EP04704837 | 23.01.2004 | US50197403 | 11.09.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI1635787T | 30.04.2012 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP04777134 | 25.06.2004 | US50194703 | 11.09.2003 | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | WO2004US20547 | 25.06.2004 | US57530704 | 28.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI1635875T | 30.04.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | WO2004US20369 | 25.06.2004 | US57530704 | 28.05.2004 | EP04756068 | 25.06.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI1696822T | 30.07.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004US35430 | 26.10.2004 | US54336804 | 09.02.2004 | US71454903 | 13.11.2003 | EP04796413 | 26.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI2233112T | 30.10.2014 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP10156691 | 26.10.2004 | US54336804 | 09.02.2004 | US71454903 | 13.11.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI356714B | 21.01.2012 | B | TW200500099 | 01.01.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US44249903 | 24.01.2003 | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | US50197403 | 11.09.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI345987B | 01.08.2011 | B | TW200505507 | 16.02.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US44249903 | 24.01.2003 | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | US50197503 | 11.09.2003 | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | US50197403 | 11.09.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200509998 | 16.03.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US44249903 | 24.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI377958B | 01.12.2012 | B | TW200514581 | 01.05.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US48267703 | 26.06.2003 | US57530704 | 28.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI367103B | 01.07.2012 | B | TW200515919 | 16.05.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US48331603 | 26.06.2003 | US50194703 | 11.09.2003 | US57530704 | 28.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI445559B | 21.07.2014 | B | TW200526285 | 16.08.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US54336804 | 09.02.2004 | US71454903 | 13.11.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI496597B | 21.08.2015 | B | TW201422269 | 16.06.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US54336804 | 09.02.2004 | US71454903 | 13.11.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI290054B | 21.11.2007 | B | Priority number | Date | US55820700 | 26.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2002102307 | 01.08.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US55820700 | 26.04.2000 | US9687702 | 14.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6375972 | 23.04.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US55820700 | 26.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200208415 | 17.10.2003 | B | Priority number | Date | US55820700 | 26.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200604777 | 30.05.2007 | B | Priority number | Date | US71454903 | 13.11.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY135804 | 31.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US37797402 | 07.05.2002 | US45234803 | 06.03.2003 | US43757602 | 31.12.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI305723B | 01.02.2009 | B | TW200400814 | 16.01.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US37797402 | 07.05.2002 | US45234803 | 06.03.2003 | US43757602 | 31.12.2002 |