EP1503731 - PROCESSES FOR FORMING A DRUG DELIVERY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Control Delivery Systems, Inc. 400 Pleasant Street Watertown, MA 02472 / US | [2011/46] |
Former [2005/06] | For all designated states Control Delivery Systems, Inc. 313 Pleasant Street Watertown, MA 02472 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASHTON, Paul 19 Brimmer Street Boston, MA 02108-1025 / US | 02 /
CHOU, Kang-Jye 52 Aldrich Road Apt. A Watertown, MA 02472 / US | 03 /
GUO, Hong 50 Sandrick Road Belmont, MA 02478 / US | 04 /
SHIMIZU, Robert, W. 531 Acorn Park Acton, MA 01720 / US | [2005/06] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/06] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03728665.5 | 01.05.2003 | [2005/06] | WO2003US13733 | Priority number, date | US20020377974P | 07.05.2002 Original published format: US 377974 P | US20020437576P | 31.12.2002 Original published format: US 437576 P | US20030452348P | 06.03.2003 Original published format: US 452348 P | [2005/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03094888 | Date: | 20.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1503731 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00 | [2005/06] | CPC: |
A61K9/0024 (EP,US);
A61K9/0004 (US);
A61K31/58 (EP,US);
A61K31/7072 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K9/0051 (US);
A61K9/0092 (EP,US);
A61K9/204 (US);
A61K9/2086 (US);
A61K9/209 (EP,US);
A61K9/284 (EP,US);
A61K9/2853 (EP,US);
A61K9/2886 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/58, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/7072, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN EINER ARZNEIMITTELVERABREICHUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2005/06] | English: | PROCESSES FOR FORMING A DRUG DELIVERY DEVICE | [2005/06] | French: | PROCEDES DE FABRICATION D'UN DISTRIBUTEUR DE MEDICAMENTS | [2005/06] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 27.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/23] | 23.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.04.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9715293 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-44* claim - *; | [AD]WO0180825 (CONTROL DELIVERY SYS INC [US], et al) [AD] 1-44 * claim - *; | [A]WO0205788 (UNIV GENT [BE], et al) [A] 1-44 * claim - * | by applicant | US6375972 | - KAJIHARA ET AL., JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, (2001), vol. 73, pages 279 - 291 |