EP1509930 - SULFONATED CONDUCTING POLYMER-GRAFTED CARBON MATERIAL FOR FUEL CELL APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COLUMBIAN CHEMICALS COMPANY 1800 West Oak Commons Court Marietta, GA 30062 / US | [2007/08] |
Former [2005/09] | For all designated states Columbian Chemicals Company 1800 West Oak Commons Court Marietta, CA 30062 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bollepalli, Srinivas 1888 Wilkenson Crossing Marietta, GA 30066 / US | [2005/09] | Representative(s) | Brown, Fraser Gregory James, et al Cleveland 10 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | Brown, Fraser Gregory James, et al fJ Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03729097.0 | 23.05.2003 | [2005/09] | WO2003US16320 | Priority number, date | US20020382665P | 23.05.2002 Original published format: US 382665 P | [2005/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03100884 | Date: | 04.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1509930 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1509930 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.05.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01B1/00, H01M4/96, H01M4/86, H01M4/88, H01M4/92, H01M8/10, C08K3/04 | [2005/39] | CPC: |
H01M8/1009 (EP,US);
H01B1/24 (KR);
H01M4/86 (KR);
H01M4/8605 (EP,US);
H01M4/92 (EP,US);
H01M4/926 (EP,US);
H01M4/96 (EP,US);
H01M8/0234 (EP,US);
H01M8/1004 (EP,US);
H01M8/1007 (EP,US);
H01M8/1023 (EP,US);
H01M8/1039 (EP,US);
H01M4/881 (EP,US);
H01M4/8828 (EP,US);
H01M4/8882 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/09] | H01B1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SULFONIERTES LEITUNGS-GRAFTPOLYMERKOHLENSTOFFMATERIAL FÜR BRENNSTOFFZELLENANWENDUNGEN | [2005/09] | English: | SULFONATED CONDUCTING POLYMER-GRAFTED CARBON MATERIAL FOR FUEL CELL APPLICATIONS | [2005/09] | French: | MATERIAU DE CARBONE A POLYMERE GREFFE CONDUCTEUR SULFONE DESTINE A DES APPLICATIONS DE PILE A COMBUSTIBLE | [2005/09] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2004 | Search fee paid | 08.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/09] | 18.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.02.2007 | BE | 21.02.2007 | CH | 21.02.2007 | CY | 21.02.2007 | CZ | 21.02.2007 | DK | 21.02.2007 | EE | 21.02.2007 | FI | 21.02.2007 | LI | 21.02.2007 | NL | 21.02.2007 | RO | 21.02.2007 | SI | 21.02.2007 | SK | 21.02.2007 | TR | 21.02.2007 | SE | 21.05.2007 | BG | 22.05.2007 | GR | 22.05.2007 | IE | 23.05.2007 | LU | 23.05.2007 | MC | 31.05.2007 | PT | 23.07.2007 | HU | 22.08.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/39] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CH | 21.02.2007 | ||
CY | 21.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
EE | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
RO | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
BG | 22.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
IE | 23.05.2007 | ||
LU | 23.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CH | 21.02.2007 | ||
CY | 21.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
EE | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
RO | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
BG | 22.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
IE | 23.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CH | 21.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
EE | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
RO | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
BG | 22.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
IE | 23.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CH | 21.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
RO | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
BG | 22.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
IE | 23.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CH | 21.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
RO | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
BG | 22.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CH | 21.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
RO | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
BG | 22.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CH | 21.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
RO | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
BG | 22.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CH | 21.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
BG | 22.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CH | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
BG | 22.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CH | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
BG | 22.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
CH | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
BG | 22.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/40] | CH | 21.02.2007 | |
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
BG | 22.05.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [L]WO03100883 (COLUMBIAN CHEM [US]) [L] 1* claim 1 * | International search | [XP]US5498372 (HEDGES WINSTON L [US]); | [XP]US6478987 (AKITA HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [A] - XIAOLIN WEI, ARTHUR J. EPSTEIN, "Synthesis of highly sulfonated polyaniline", SYNTHETIC METALS, (1995), vol. 74, pages 123 - 125, XP002974770 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0379-6779(95)03362-9 |