EP1468278 - DEVICE, USE OF SAID DEVICE, AND SEPARATION AGENT FOR SEPARATING PARTICLES BY MEANS OF FREE FLOW ELECTROPHORESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2008 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tecan Trading AG Seestrasse 103 8708 Männedorf / CH | [2004/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ECKERSKORN, Christoph Ludwig-Thoma-Str. 12 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | 02 /
GRILL, Hans-Jörg Kugelgasse 7 CH-8708 Männedorf / CH | 03 /
WEBER, Gerhard Margeritenweg 23 85551 Kirchheim / DE | 04 /
WEBER, Peter Galvanistraat 35 2517 RA, Den Haag / NL | 05 /
YOST, David 19617 Selby Av. Poolesvilla, MD 20837 / US | [2004/52] |
Former [2004/43] | 01 /
ECKERSKORN, Christoph Ludwig-Thoma-Str. 12 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | ||
02 /
GRILL, Hans-Jörg Kugelgasse 7 CH-8708 Männedorf / CH | |||
03 /
WEBER, Gerhard Margeritenweg 23 85551 Kirchheim / DE | |||
04 /
WEBER, Peter Guldeinstr. 44 80339 München / DE | |||
05 /
YOST, David 19617 Selby Av. Poolesvilla, MD 20837 / US | Representative(s) | Heusch, Christian OK pat AG Industriestrasse 47 6300 Zug / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2004/43] | Heusch, Christian OK pat AG Chamerstrasse 50 6300 Zug / CH | Application number, filing date | 03729399.0 | 20.01.2003 | [2004/43] | WO2003CH00034 | Priority number, date | CH20020008602 | 21.01.2002 Original published format: CH 86022002 | US20020352366P | 28.01.2002 Original published format: US 352366 P | [2004/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03060503 | Date: | 24.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1468278 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/447 | [2004/43] | CPC: |
G01N27/44795 (EP);
G01N27/44726 (EP);
G01N27/44769 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG, VERWENDUNG DER VORRICHTUNG UND TRENNMITTEL ZUM TRENNEN VON TEILCHEN IN DER FREE-FLOW-ELEKTROPHORESE | [2004/43] | English: | DEVICE, USE OF SAID DEVICE, AND SEPARATION AGENT FOR SEPARATING PARTICLES BY MEANS OF FREE FLOW ELECTROPHORESIS | [2004/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF, UTILISATION ASSOCIEE ET AGENT DE SEPARATION POUR SEPARER DES PARTICULES PAR ELECTROPHORESE LIBRE | [2004/43] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/43] | 30.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/39] | 06.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4465582 (RICHMAN DAVID W) [Y] 1,2,10,28,29 * column 5, line 7 - line 51; figure 4; claims 1,2 *; | [Y]US5284558 (LINHARDT ROBERT J ET AL) [Y] 1,2,10,28,29 * column 3, line 38 - column 4, line 6 *; | [AD]US5948231 (NASHABEH WASSIM A ET AL) [AD] 1 * column 6, line 15 - line 33 * * column 11, line 14 - line 43 *; | [A]US2001015320 (ANDERSON NORMAN G ET AL) [A] 1 * page 1, column L, line 34 - line 38 *; | [A]US2001027918 (JAFFE CLAUDIA B ET AL) [A] 17,22 * page 7, column R, line 32 *; | [A]DE4139472 (WEBER G.) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0103965 (ICI PLC) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]WO0177655 (INVITROGEN CORP) [A] 18 * page 18, line 9 - line 21 * | Examination | - VÖLKL A. ET AL, "Isolation of rat hepatic peroxisomes by means of immune free flow electrophoresis", ELECTROPHORESIS, (1997), vol. 18, pages 774 - 780, XP007901237 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/elps.1150180519 | - BONDY B. ET AL, "Sodium chloride in separation medium enhances cell compatibility of free electrophoresis", ELECTROPHORESIS, (1995), vol. 16, pages 92 - 97, XP008008220 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/elps.1150160116 |