EP1470220 - SELECTIVE ENZYMATIC ESTERIFICATION AND SOLVOLYSIS OF EPIMERIC VITAMIN D ANALOG AND SEPARATION OF THE EPIMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5 Basel Street, P.O. Box 3190 49131 Petah Tiqva / IL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/44] | For all designated states TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. 5 Basel Street, P.O. Box 3190 49131 Petah Tiqva / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHAPIRO, Evgeny 18/1 Gut Levin St. 32922 Haifa / IL | 02 /
FISHMAN, Ayelet 25 Beilis St. 34814 Haifa / IL | 03 /
EFFENBERGER, Reinhard 17 Harofeh St. 34367 Haifa / IL | 04 /
MAYMON, Asher 79 Menachem Begin St. 49732 Petach Tikva / IL | 05 /
SCHWARTZ, Anchel Aharoni 11/9 Rehovot 76281 / IL | [2004/44] | Representative(s) | Gallagher, Kirk James, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/50] | Gallagher, Kirk James, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2004/44] | Bradley, Josephine Mary, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03729607.6 | 09.01.2003 | [2004/44] | WO2003US00623 | Priority number, date | US20020348082P | 10.01.2002 Original published format: US 348082 P | US20020349977P | 18.01.2002 Original published format: US 349977 P | [2004/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03060094 | Date: | 24.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1470220 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1470220 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12P41/00 | [2007/49] | CPC: |
C12P7/18 (EP,US);
C12P7/62 (KR);
C12N9/0004 (KR);
C12P41/004 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/44] | C12N9/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/44] | Extension states | RO | 21.07.2004 | Title | German: | SELEKTIVE ENZYMATISCHE VERESTERUNG UND SOLVOLYSE EINES EPIMEREN VITAMIN-D-ANALOGS SOWIE TRENNUNG DER EPIMERE | [2004/44] | English: | SELECTIVE ENZYMATIC ESTERIFICATION AND SOLVOLYSIS OF EPIMERIC VITAMIN D ANALOG AND SEPARATION OF THE EPIMERS | [2004/44] | French: | ESTERIFICATION ET SOLVOLYSE ENZYMATIQUES SELECTIVES D'UN ANALOGUE EPIMERIQUE DE LA VITAMINE D ET SEPARATION DES EPIMERES | [2004/44] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2004 | Search fee paid | 21.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.07.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/44] | 27.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.03.2008 | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.01.2003 | AT | 05.10.2011 | BE | 05.10.2011 | CY | 05.10.2011 | CZ | 05.10.2011 | DK | 05.10.2011 | EE | 05.10.2011 | FI | 05.10.2011 | SE | 05.10.2011 | SI | 05.10.2011 | SK | 05.10.2011 | TR | 05.10.2011 | BG | 05.01.2012 | GR | 06.01.2012 | IE | 09.01.2012 | LU | 09.01.2012 | CH | 31.01.2012 | LI | 31.01.2012 | MC | 31.01.2012 | PT | 06.02.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
TR | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IE | 09.01.2012 | ||
LU | 09.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
TR | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IE | 09.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IE | 09.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IE | 09.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | SI | 05.10.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8700834 (LEO PHARM PROD LTD [DK]) [A] 1-40 * Abstract; Formula I. *; | [A]US5637500 (SIH CHARLES J [US]) [A] 1,11,29,30,32,33 * Abstract; claim 1, examples, col. 4, l. 35-40. *; | [A]WO0061777 (CHIROTECH TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB]) [A] 1,11,29,30,32,33 * Abstract; claim 1, examples, p. 6, l. 1-9, p. 7, l. 18-20. *; | [A]WO0190396 (DSM NV [NL], et al) [A] 1,11,29,30,32,33 * Abstract; claim 1, examples. *; | [E]WO03106412 (TEVA PHARMA [IL], et al) [E] 1-40* Abstract; claim 1, examples 9, 13 and 14. *; | [DA] - CALVERLEY M J, "SYNTHESIS OF MC 903, A BIOLOGICALLY ACTIVE VITAMIN D METABOLITE ANALOGUE", TETRAHEDRON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1987), vol. 43, no. 20, ISSN 0040-4020, pages 4609 - 4619, XP001147723 [DA] 1-40 * Abstract; compounds 1-29. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(01)86903-9 | [A] - CALVERLEY M J ET AL, "1-alpha-24S-dihydroxy-26,27-cyclo-22-yne-vitamin D3: the side chain triple bond analogue of MC 903 (calcipotriol)", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, OXFORD, GB, (1993), vol. 3, no. 9, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 1841 - 1844, XP002273655 [A] 1-40 * Abstract, compounds 1-13. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(00)80116-X | International search | [A]US5665716 (KIRSCH GERALD DR [DE], et al) |