29.08.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] |
06.04.2007 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 09.05.2007 [2007/19] |
11.08.2006 |
Correction of patent specification |
published on 13.09.2006 [2006/37] |
12.05.2006 |
Change - applicant |
published on 14.06.2006 [2006/24] |
14.04.2006 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 31.05.2006 [2006/22] |
01.04.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
01.04.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
24.03.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.11.2005 |
Change - German title |
published on 11.01.2006 [2006/02] |
24.11.2005 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.11.2005 |
Change - German title |
published on 28.12.2005 [2005/52] |
08.07.2005 |
Change - designated states |
published on 24.08.2005 [2005/34] |
08.07.2005 |
Change - extension states |
published on 24.08.2005 [2005/34] |
06.05.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.01.2005 |
Change - inventor |
published on 09.03.2005 [2005/10] |
17.12.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.02.2005 [2005/05] |
17.12.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.02.2005 [2005/05] |
10.11.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.11.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.11.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.11.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.07.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|