EP1502371 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING AT LEAST ONE TRANSPONDER FREQUENCY IN THE SATELLITE INTERMEDIATE FREQUENCY PLANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/05] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING AT LEAST ONE TRANSPONDER IN THE SATELLITE INTERMEDIATE FREQUENCY PLANE | ||
[2005/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kathrein-Werke KG Anton-Kathrein-Strasse 1-3 83022 Rosenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/24] | For all designated states Kathrein Werke KG Anton-Kathrein-Strasse 1-3 83022 Rosenheim / DE | ||
Former [2005/05] | For all designated states Kathrein Werke AG Anton-Kathrein-Strasse 1-3 83022 Rosenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ILSANKER, Anton Falkensteinstrasse 14 83083 Riedering / DE | 02 /
HEISENBERG, Michael Wiederhopfstrasse 4a 83059 Kolbermoor / DE | 03 /
EXLER, Ralf Bodenseestr. 26 83059 Kolbermoor / DE | 04 /
MUMMERT, Wolfgang Edling-Angerfeldstrasse 2 83134 Prutting / DE | 05 /
LINKE, Christian Adelstetten 27 83404 Ainring / DE | [2005/10] |
Former [2005/05] | 01 /
ILSANKER, Anton Falkensteinstrasse 14 83083 Riedering / DE | ||
02 /
HEISENBERG, Michael Wiederhopfstrasse 4a 83059 Kolbermoor / DE | |||
03 /
EXLER, Ralf Sepp-Strassberger-Strasse 26 83059 Kolbermoor / DE | |||
04 /
MUMMERT, Wolfgang Edling-Angerfeldstrasse 2 83134 Prutting / DE | |||
05 /
LINKE, Christian Adelstetten 27 83404 Ainring / DE | Representative(s) | Flach, Dieter Rolf Paul, et al Andrae l Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Adlzreiterstrasse 11 83022 Rosenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Flach, Dieter Rolf Paul, et al Andrae Flach Haug Adlzreiterstrasse 11 83022 Rosenheim / DE | ||
Former [2005/05] | Flach, Dieter Dipl.-Ing, et al Andrae Flach Haug Adlzreiterstrasse 11 83022 Rosenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 03729960.9 | 01.05.2003 | [2005/05] | WO2003EP04583 | Priority number, date | DE2002119847 | 03.05.2002 Original published format: DE 10219847 | [2005/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03094397 | Date: | 13.11.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1502371 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1502371 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/22] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1502371 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | [2006/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04H1/00, H04B1/26, H04B1/18 | [2005/05] | CPC: |
H04H40/90 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, LI, NL [2005/34] |
Former [2005/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN SOWIE VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG ZUMINDEST EINER TRANSPONDERFREQUENZ IN DER SATELLITEN-ZWISCHENFREQUENZ-EBENE | [2006/02] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING AT LEAST ONE TRANSPONDER FREQUENCY IN THE SATELLITE INTERMEDIATE FREQUENCY PLANE | [2005/52] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION D'AU MOINS UNE FREQUENCE TRANSPONDEUR DANS LE PLAN DE FREQUENCE INTERMEDIAIRE DE SATELLITE | [2005/52] |
Former [2005/05] | VERFAHREN SOWIE VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG ZUMINDEST EINES TRANSPONDERS IN DER SATELLITEN-ZWISCHENFREQUENZ-EBENE | ||
Former [2005/05] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING AT LEAST ONE TRANSPONDER IN THE SATELLITE INTERMEDIATE FREQUENCY PLANE | ||
Former [2005/05] | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION D'AU MOINS UN TRANSBORDEUR DANS LE PLAN DE FREQUENCE INTERMEDIAIRE DE SATELLITE | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/05] | 01.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4126774 (KATHREIN WERKE KG [DE]) [A] 1-12 * page 2, line 18 - page 3, line 56 *; | [A]DE9306499U (RICHARD HIRSCHMANN GMBH) [A] 1-12 * page 3, line 17 - page 12, line 4 *; | [A]DE29716786U (YEN KERL [TW]) [A] 1-12 * page 4, line 17 - page 5, line 28 *; | [DA]DE19713124 (KATHREIN WERKE KG [DE]) [DA] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US5959592 (PETRUZZELLI EDMUND F [US]) [A] 1-12 * column 7, line 64 - column 8, line 61 *; | [A]EP1076458 (KATHREIN WERKE KG [DE]) [A] 1-12* the whole document * |