EP1513423 - A STRAP COUPLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Embrace Limited Ashford House, Tara Street Dublin 1 / IE | [2008/47] |
Former [2005/11] | For all designated states Embrace Limited Ashford House, Tara Street Dublin 1 / IE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ward, Bernie 12 Cambridge Avenue, Ringsend Dublin 4 / IE | 02 /
Hickey, Marese 22 Pembroke Cottages, Donnybrook Dublin 4 / IE | [2005/11] | Representative(s) | O'Connell, Maura, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/11] | O'Connell, Maura, et al F. R. Kelly & Co., 27 Clyde Road, Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 03730107.4 | 21.05.2003 | [2005/11] | WO2003EP05443 | Priority number, date | IE20020000406 | 21.05.2002 Original published format: IE 20020406 | [2005/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03096831 | Date: | 27.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1513423 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1513423 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A41F15/00 | [2005/11] | CPC: |
A41F15/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/11] | Extension states | AL | 21.12.2004 | LT | 21.12.2004 | LV | 21.12.2004 | MK | 21.12.2004 | Title | German: | KUPPLUNG FÜR TRÄGER | [2005/11] | English: | A STRAP COUPLING | [2005/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COUPLAGE DE BRETELLE | [2005/11] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/11] | 09.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 19.11.2008 | CY | 19.11.2008 | CZ | 19.11.2008 | EE | 19.11.2008 | FI | 19.11.2008 | RO | 19.11.2008 | SI | 19.11.2008 | SK | 19.11.2008 | BG | 19.02.2009 | GR | 20.02.2009 | PT | 20.04.2009 | HU | 20.05.2009 | LU | 21.05.2009 | MC | 31.05.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/31] | BE | 19.11.2008 | |
CZ | 19.11.2008 | ||
EE | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
RO | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
SK | 19.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
GR | 20.02.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
HU | 20.05.2009 | ||
LU | 21.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | BE | 19.11.2008 | |
CZ | 19.11.2008 | ||
EE | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
RO | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
SK | 19.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
GR | 20.02.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
LU | 21.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | BE | 19.11.2008 | |
CZ | 19.11.2008 | ||
EE | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
RO | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
SK | 19.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
GR | 20.02.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | BE | 19.11.2008 | |
CZ | 19.11.2008 | ||
EE | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
RO | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
SK | 19.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | BE | 19.11.2008 | |
CZ | 19.11.2008 | ||
EE | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
RO | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
SK | 19.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | BE | 19.11.2008 | |
CZ | 19.11.2008 | ||
EE | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
RO | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | BE | 19.11.2008 | |
EE | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
RO | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | BE | 19.11.2008 | |
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | BE | 19.11.2008 | |
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/26] | FI | 19.11.2008 | |
SI | 19.11.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2437714 (THOMASON JR WALTER A) [A] 1,2 * column 1, line 29 - column 2, line 29; figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO9535045 (PERRY DON A [US]) [A] 1,2 * page 3, line 11 - page 5, line 17; figures 1-4; claim 1 *; | [A]DE19721225 (FLOR JUERGEN [DE]) [A] 1,5,6,8,9 * the whole document *; | [A]US6086451 (FERNANDES MARCIA [US]); | [A]WO0232241 (LIBERTI SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1,2,9,10,13,14 * page 3, line 1 - paragraph L; figures 1,3,4; claims 1,2 * |