|
04.11.2011 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2007 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2006 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2006 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2006 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2006 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2006 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.03.2006 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.11.2005 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2005 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.11.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
29.12.2004 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2004 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.11.2004 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.11.2004 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.11.2004 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.11.2004 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2004 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
15.11.2004 |
Notification of submission or transmittal of priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2004 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.06.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
19.03.2004 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.03.2004 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.02.2004 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
18.02.2004 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.02.2004 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.02.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.02.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.02.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
18.02.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
18.02.2004 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.02.2004 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.12.2003 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.12.2003 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.12.2003 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.12.2003 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.12.2003 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
02.12.2003 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
02.12.2003 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
02.12.2003 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
02.12.2003 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
02.12.2003 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
01.12.2003 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
01.12.2003 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.12.2003 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.12.2003 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
01.12.2003 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
01.12.2003 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
27.11.2003 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.11.2003 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
30.06.2003 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
30.06.2003 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
30.06.2003 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
9 |
|
30.06.2003 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
5 |