18.09.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] |
21.08.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] |
03.10.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] |
15.08.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] |
18.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] |
07.09.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.10.2007 [2007/41] |
31.08.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.10.2007 [2007/40] |
08.06.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2007 [2007/28] |
01.06.2007 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 04.07.2007 [2007/27] |
04.05.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2007 [2007/23] |
27.04.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.05.2007 [2007/22] |
06.04.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.05.2007 [2007/19] |
02.03.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.04.2007 [2007/14] |
15.12.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.01.2007 [2007/03] |
23.06.2006 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 26.07.2006 [2006/30] |
09.06.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.03.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
11.03.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
10.03.2006 |
Change - priority |
published on 26.04.2006 [2006/17] |
12.11.2005 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.07.2005 |
Change - extension states |
published on 07.09.2005 [2005/36] |
08.06.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.12.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.02.2005 [2005/06] |
24.12.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.02.2005 [2005/06] |
25.11.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.11.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.12.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.08.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.07.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|