EP1514130 - PROBABILISTIC MODEL FOR A POSITIONING TECHNIQUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AiRISTA Flow, Inc. 12 Timber Creek Lane Newark, DE 19711 / US | For all designated states AiRISTA International Oy Vaisalantie 6 02130 Espoo / FI | [2018/34] |
Former [2005/11] | For all designated states Ekahau Oy Tammasaarenlaituri 3 00180 Helsinki / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MISIKANGAS, Pauli Nallitie 6 C 12 FIN-00940 Helsinki / FI | 02 /
MYLLYMÄKI, Petri Kartanonkaari 31 D FIN-00410 Helsinki / FI | [2005/11] | Representative(s) | Kolster Oy Ab (Salmisaarenaukio 1) P.O. Box 204 00181 Helsinki / FI | [2018/38] |
Former [2013/43] | Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 PO Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2005/11] | Virkkala, Jukka Antero Kolster Oy Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 03730250.2 | 27.05.2003 | [2005/11] | WO2003FI00413 | Priority number, date | FI20020001044 | 31.05.2002 Original published format: FI 20021044 | [2005/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03102622 | Date: | 11.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1514130 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1514130 | Date: | 19.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 11.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/02, H04W64/00, G01S3/06 | [2018/13] | CPC: |
G01S3/06 (EP,US);
G01S5/02528 (EP,US);
H04W64/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/11] | G01S5/02, H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/38] |
Former [2005/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | PROBABILISTISCHES MODELL FÜR EINE POSITIONIERUNGSTECHNIK | [2005/11] | English: | PROBABILISTIC MODEL FOR A POSITIONING TECHNIQUE | [2005/11] | French: | MODELE PROBABILISTE POUR UNE TECHNIQUE DE POSITIONNEMENT | [2005/11] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/11] | 16.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 25.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR | Date: | 01.10.2013 | [2013/50] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.05.2003 | AT | 19.09.2018 | CY | 19.09.2018 | CZ | 19.09.2018 | EE | 19.09.2018 | FI | 19.09.2018 | MC | 19.09.2018 | RO | 19.09.2018 | SI | 19.09.2018 | SK | 19.09.2018 | TR | 19.09.2018 | BG | 19.12.2018 | GR | 20.12.2018 | PT | 19.01.2019 | LU | 27.05.2019 | BE | 31.05.2019 | CH | 31.05.2019 | LI | 31.05.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CY | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
LU | 27.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
LU | 27.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
LU | 27.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
LU | 27.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CZ | 19.09.2018 | |
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 19.09.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2001313972 ; | [A]US6263208 (CHANG KIRK K [US], et al); | [X]RU2183021 (GARMONOV ALEKSANDR VASIL EVICH) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020403), vol. 2002, no. 3, & JP2001313972 A 20011109 (NTT DOCOMO INC) | Examination | US6393294 | - A L Read, "Tel Linear interpolation of histograms", Physics Research A, (19990101), pages 357 - 360, URL: http://www.sciencedirect.com/science/article/pii/S0168900298013473/pdfft?md5=6ec8fb02549f59aa7c77a1a0908a657f&pid=1-s2.0-S0168900298013473-main.pdf, (20161128), XP055323475 | by applicant | JP2001313972 | US6393294 |