EP1513063 - PORTABLE TERMINAL, METHOD, PROGRAM, AND STORAGE MEDIUM FOR MANAGING APPLICATION START [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2017 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/10] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAMIYA, Dai, NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 2-11-1 Nagatacho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
YAMADA, Kazuhiro, NTT DoCoMo, Inc Sanno Park Tower, t2-11-1 Nagatacho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
KONDO, Takashi, NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 2-11-1 Nagatacho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 04 /
YAMANE, Naoki, NTT DoCoMo, Inc Sanno Park Tower, 2-11-1 Nagatacho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 05 /
SUMI, Yutaka 23-8-502 Higashiazabu 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 106-0044 / JP | [2005/11] |
Former [2005/10] | 01 /
Kamiya, Dai, NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 2-11-1 Nagatacho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | ||
02 /
Yamada, Kazuhiro, NTT DoCoMo, Inc Sanno Park Tower, t2-11-1 Nagatacho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
03 /
Kondo, Takashi, NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 2-11-1 Nagatacho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
04 /
Yamane, Naoki, NTT DoCoMo, Inc Sanno Park Tower, 2-11-1 Nagatacho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
05 /
Sumi, Yutaka 23-8-502 Higashiazabu 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 106-0044 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/10] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03730523.2 | 19.05.2003 | [2005/10] | WO2003JP06218 | Priority number, date | JP20020145281 | 20.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002145281 | [2005/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03098432 | Date: | 27.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1513063 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.11.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44, G06F9/46, G06F9/48, G06F1/00 | [2007/37] | CPC: |
G06F21/64 (EP,US);
G06F21/51 (EP,US);
G06F9/468 (EP,US);
G06F9/4843 (EP,US);
G06F2209/482 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/10] | G06F9/44 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRAGBARES ENDGERÄT, VERFAHREN, PROGRAMM UND SPEICHERMEDIUM ZUM VERWALTEN DES ANWENDUNGSSTARTS | [2005/10] | English: | PORTABLE TERMINAL, METHOD, PROGRAM, AND STORAGE MEDIUM FOR MANAGING APPLICATION START | [2005/10] | French: | TERMINAL PORTABLE, PROCEDE, PROGRAMME ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT POUR GERER LE LANCEMENT D'UNE APPLICATION | [2005/10] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2004 | Translation filed | 16.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2004 | Search fee paid | 16.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/10] | 15.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/40] | 30.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/40] | Divisional application(s) | EP16170599.1 / EP3109756 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.04.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2017 | 15   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0570123 (FISCHER ADDISON M [US]) [Y] 1-12,26 * abstract * * column 8, line 40 - line 46 * * column 10, line 57 - column 11, line 51 * * column 14, line 8 - column 15, line 58 * * column 18, line 53 - column 19, line 10 * * column 21, line 4 - line 16 * * column 23, line 5 - column 24, line 22 *; | [Y]WO9930217 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-12,26 * abstract * * page 2, line 16 - line 19 * * page 3, line 9 - page 4, line 1 * * page 8, line 14 - page 9, line 31 *; | [X]WO9964946 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 13-25,27 * page 1, line 12 - page 3, line 15; figures 2,3,810,11,12,19 * * page 9, line 14 - line 23 * * page 10, line 7 - page 11, line 32 * * page 16, line 10 - page 17, line 13 * * page 22, line 30 - page 24, line 14 * * page 27, line 5 - page 28, line 19 * * page 33, line 21 - page 34, line 14 * * page 36, line 1 - line 12 *; | [A]GB2350528 (3COM CORP [US]) [A] 13-25,27 * page 7, line 29 - page 8, line 3 * * page 9, line 23 - page 10, line 3 * * page 19, line 15 - page 20, line 13 * * page 21, line 24 - page 22, line 14 *; | [A]EP1132796 (UNIV LOUVAIN [BE]) [A] 1-12,26 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0075] *; | [A]EP1182834 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 13-25,27* paragraph [0320] - paragraph [0346]; figures 24,35,36 * | International search | [A]JPH11110219 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [Y]JP2001117769 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JP2001156942 (SONY CORP); | [Y]JP2001333155 (SNK CORP); | [A]JP2002091850 (TECHFIRM KK); | [Y] - KINOSHITA, "Mail Client NobitaMail Intercom, Java World", KABUSHIKI KAISHA IDG COMMUNICATIONS, (19981001), vol. 2, no. 10, pages 52 - 54, XP002975476 | [A] - TANAKA, "Jissen Nyumon HTML denshi meil, oh! PC", SOFTBANK CORP., (19990301), vol. 17, no. 11, pages 161 - 166, XP002975477 | Examination | - Charles Kozierok, "NTFS Permissions (The PC Guide v2.2.0)", (20010511), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20010511083739/http://www.pcguide.com/ref/hdd/file/ntfs/secPerm-c.html, (20161212), XP055328102 |