EP1510511 - GINGEROL ANALOGUES AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.2006 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOAGOSEI CO., LTD. 14-1, Nishishimbashi 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8419 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | For all designated states TOAGOSEI CO., LTD. 14-1, Nishishimbashi 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8419 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATO, Hisatoyo, Toagosei Co., Ltd. Corporate Research Laboratory, 2, Ohkubo Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 300-2611 / JP | 02 /
YAMAGUCHI, Shuhei, Toagosei Co., Ltd. Corporate Research Laboratory, 2, Ohkubo Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 300-2611 / JP | [2005/09] | Representative(s) | Pohlmann, Eckart WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER, Patentanwälte, Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | Pohlmann, Eckart, Dipl.-Phys. WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER, Patentanwälte, Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03730610.7 | 23.05.2003 | [2005/09] | WO2003JP06470 | Priority number, date | JP20020152725 | 27.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002152725 | JP20030014030 | 22.01.2003 Original published format: JP 2003014030 | [2005/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03099752 | Date: | 04.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1510511 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07C43/178, C07C43/23, C07C49/255, A61K7/00, A61K7/48, A61K31/075, A61K31/085, A61P31/12, A61P17/00, A61P39/06, A61P43/00 | [2005/09] | CPC: |
C07C49/255 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P39/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07C43/23 (EP,US);
C07C45/71 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C45/71, C07C49/255 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/09] | Title | German: | GINGEROLANALOGA UND DEREN ANWENDUNG | [2005/09] | English: | GINGEROL ANALOGUES AND USE THEREOF | [2005/09] | French: | ANALOGUES DE GINGEROL ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2005/09] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2004 | Translation filed | 23.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2004 | Search fee paid | 23.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 23.11.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/09] | 27.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/32] | 13.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - H. KIKUZAKI AND N. NAKATANI, "ANTIOXIDANT EFFECTS OF SOME GINGER CONSTITUENTS", JOURNAL OF FOOD SCIENCE, JAPAN, (1993), vol. 58, no. 6, pages 1407 - 1410, XP008054361 [A] 1-4 * figure 4; compounds 1-5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2621.1993.tb06194.x | [A] - MATHIAS JUCH AND PETER RUEDI, "ISOLATION, STRUCTURE, AND BIOLOGICAL ACTIVITIES OF LONG-CHAIN CATECHOLS OF PLECTRANTHUS SYLVESTRIS (LABIATAE)", HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA., CHVERLAG HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA. BASEL., (1997), vol. 80, pages 436 - 448, XP008054402 [A] 1-4 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hlca.19970800209 | [A] - F. KHANOM, H. KAYAHARA AND K. TADASA, "Tyrosinase Inhibitory Activity of Bangladeshi Indigenous Medicinal Plants", BIOSCI. BIOTECHNOL. BIOCHEM., (2000), vol. 64, no. 9, ISSN 0918-6158, pages 1967 - 1969, XP008054428 [A] 1-4 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1271/bbb.64.1967 | International search | [A] - SACHICO SHIROTA ET AL., "Tyrosinase inhibitors from crude drugs", BIOLOGICAL & PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN, (1994), vol. 17, no. 2, pages 266 - 269, XP002972144 |