21.12.2007 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] |
31.08.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.10.2007 [2007/40] |
20.04.2007 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] |
12.05.2006 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.06.2006 [2006/24] |
12.04.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
12.04.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
07.04.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.12.2005 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.08.2005 |
Change - designated states |
published on 21.09.2005 [2005/38] |
15.07.2005 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 31.08.2005 [2005/35] |
09.06.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.01.2005 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.03.2005 [2005/11] |
28.01.2005 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.03.2005 [2005/11] |
24.01.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.01.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.01.2005 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
04.01.2005 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
24.12.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.03.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.12.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.12.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.12.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.07.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|