EP1515064 - ELECTROMAGNETIC SHOCK ABSORBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAYABA INDUSTRY CO., LTD. World Trade Center Bldg, 2-4-1, Hamamatsu-cho Minato-Ku Tokyo 105-6190 / JP | For all designated states The Foundation for the Promotion of Industrial Science 6-1, Komaba 4-chome Meguro-ku, Tokyo 153-0041 / JP | [2006/24] |
Former [2005/11] | For all designated states KAYABA INDUSTRY CO., LTD. World Trade Center Bldg, 2-4-1, Hamamatsu-cho Minato-Ku, Tokyo 105-6190 / JP | ||
For all designated states The Foundation for the Promotion of Industrial Science 6-1, Komaba 4-chome Meguro-ku, Tokyo 153-0041 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KONDO, Takuhiro c/o KAYABA INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 4-1, Hamamatsu-cho 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-6190 / JP | 02 /
YAMAGATA, Hideki c/o KAYABA INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 4-1, Hamamatsu-cho 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-6190 / JP | 03 /
SUDA, Yoshihiro 33-4, Denenchofu 2-chome Oota-ku, Tokyo 145-0071 / JP | [2005/11] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/11] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03730663.6 | 28.05.2003 | [2005/11] | WO2003JP06670 | Priority number, date | JP20020155080 | 29.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002155080 | JP20020165784 | 06.06.2002 Original published format: JP 2002165784 | [2005/11] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03100291 | Date: | 04.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1515064 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1515064 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16F15/03 | [2005/11] | CPC: |
F16F15/03 (EP,KR,US);
F16F2232/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2005/38] |
Former [2005/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ELEKTROMAGNETISCHER STOSSDÄMPFER | [2005/11] | English: | ELECTROMAGNETIC SHOCK ABSORBER | [2005/11] | French: | AMORTISSEUR ELECTROMAGNETIQUE | [2005/11] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2004 | Translation filed | 16.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2004 | Search fee paid | 16.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 16.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/11] | 16.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/40] | IT | 14.06.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3522221 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract ** figures 1,2 * | International search | [Y]JPS57205422U ; | [Y]JPH0391551U ; | [Y]JP2001173676 (DENSO CORP, et al) |