EP1510050 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING E-MAIL TO A MOBILE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oracle International Corporation 500 Oracle Parkway Redwood Shores, CA 94065 / US | [2005/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAY, Jia-Der 759 E, Meadow Dr. Palo Alt, CA 94303 / US | [2006/20] |
Former [2005/09] | 01 /
DAY, Jia-Der 968 Governors Bay Drive Redwood Shores, CA 94065 / US | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 03731319.4 | 21.05.2003 | [2005/09] | WO2003US16132 | Priority number, date | US20020159223 | 31.05.2002 Original published format: US 159223 | [2005/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03103218 | Date: | 11.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1510050 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1510050 | Date: | 11.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/58, H04L29/06 | [2005/09] | CPC: |
H04L67/04 (EP,US);
H04L51/212 (EP,US);
H04L51/58 (EP,US);
H04L67/306 (EP,US);
H04L67/5651 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04L69/329 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/09] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG ELEKTRONISCHER POST AN EIN MOBILES GERÄT | [2005/09] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING E-MAIL TO A MOBILE DEVICE | [2005/09] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR CONTROLER LE FLUX DE DONNEES TRANSMIS A UN DISPOSITIF MOBILE | [2005/09] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/10] | 21.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   07.11.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.07.2007 | BE | 11.07.2007 | CH | 11.07.2007 | CY | 11.07.2007 | CZ | 11.07.2007 | DK | 11.07.2007 | EE | 11.07.2007 | FI | 11.07.2007 | LI | 11.07.2007 | RO | 11.07.2007 | SI | 11.07.2007 | SK | 11.07.2007 | TR | 11.07.2007 | BG | 11.10.2007 | SE | 11.10.2007 | GR | 12.10.2007 | ES | 22.10.2007 | PT | 11.12.2007 | HU | 12.01.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/34] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
CY | 11.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2007 | ||
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
EE | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
RO | 11.07.2007 | ||
SI | 11.07.2007 | ||
SK | 11.07.2007 | ||
BG | 11.10.2007 | ||
SE | 11.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
HU | 12.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
CY | 11.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2007 | ||
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
EE | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
RO | 11.07.2007 | ||
SI | 11.07.2007 | ||
SK | 11.07.2007 | ||
BG | 11.10.2007 | ||
SE | 11.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2007 | ||
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
EE | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
RO | 11.07.2007 | ||
SI | 11.07.2007 | ||
SK | 11.07.2007 | ||
BG | 11.10.2007 | ||
SE | 11.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2007 | ||
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
EE | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
RO | 11.07.2007 | ||
SK | 11.07.2007 | ||
BG | 11.10.2007 | ||
SE | 11.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2007 | ||
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
RO | 11.07.2007 | ||
SK | 11.07.2007 | ||
BG | 11.10.2007 | ||
SE | 11.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2007 | ||
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
SK | 11.07.2007 | ||
BG | 11.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
BG | 11.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
BG | 11.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
BG | 11.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 11.07.2007 | |
BG | 11.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | BG | 11.10.2007 | |
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | ES | 22.10.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0932320 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1-13,19-27,33-36 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0040]; figure 5 *; | [X]EP1063821 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 14-18,28-32 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0036] *; | [X]US2002004855 (COX STEVE [US], et al) [X] 14-18,33-36 * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0052] *; | [X]US6363140 (PINARD DEBBIE [CA]) [X] 19-23* column 3, line 13 - line 28 * | Examination | - CRISPIN M., "Internet Message Access Protocol - version 4rev1", IETF, (199612), URL: www.imap.org/docs/rfc2060.html, XP002122132 |