EP1534557 - ILLUMINATED SURFACES IN THE INTERIOR OF AN AUTOMOBILE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states METHODE ELECTRONICS, Inc. 7401 West Wilson Avenue Chicago Illinois 60706 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/22] | For all designated states METHODE ELECTRONICS, Inc. 7401 West Wilson Avenue Chicago, Illinois 60706 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAMAMURTHY, Rajkumar 887 Chaseway Boulevard Auburn Hills, MI 48236 / US | 02 /
KHOURY, Joseph, E. Feldbrucker Weg 30 55457 Gensingen / DE | 03 /
RUEGENBERG, Roland Staudernheimer Str. 79a 55566 Bad Sobernheim / DE | [2006/38] |
Former [2005/22] | 01 /
RAMAMURTHY, Rajkumar 887 Chaseway Boulevard Auburn Hills, MI 48236 / US | ||
02 /
KHOURY, Joseph, E. Franz Killian Strasse 15 55442 Stromberg / DE | |||
03 /
RUEGENBERG, Roland Staudernheimer Str. 79a 55566 Bad Sobernheim / DE | Representative(s) | Townsend, Victoria Jayne, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | Townsend, Victoria Jayne, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | ||
Former [2007/24] | Townsend, Victoria Jayne, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley, Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | ||
Former [2005/22] | Fry, Alan Valentine FRY HEATH & SPENCE LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03731413.5 | 28.05.2003 | [2005/22] | WO2003US16770 | Priority number, date | US20020170627 | 14.06.2002 Original published format: US 170627 | [2005/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03106218 | Date: | 24.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1534557 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/00, B60Q3/02 | [2009/01] | CPC: |
B60Q1/1469 (EP,US);
B60Q3/12 (EP,US);
B60Q3/283 (EP,US);
B60Q3/68 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/22] | B60Q1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BELEUCHTETE FLÄCHEN IM INNEREN EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS | [2005/22] | English: | ILLUMINATED SURFACES IN THE INTERIOR OF AN AUTOMOBILE | [2005/22] | French: | SURFACES ECLAIREES A L'INTERIEUR D'UN VEHICULE | [2005/22] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2004 | Search fee paid | 07.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/22] | 21.02.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/25] | 03.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.03.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2152886 (ALFA ROMEO AUTO SPA) [X] 11-15,17 * page 1, column R, lines 94-120; figure 3 *; | [XY]DE19855554 (KOSTAL LEOPOLD GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-20,22,23 * column 4, lines 9-34; figure 1 * [Y] 21; | [A]EP1118502 (VIBRACHOC SA [FR]) [A] 1-23* paragraphs [0011] - [0018]; figure - *; | [X]JP2001354064 (NILES PARTS CO LTD) [X] 1,4-12,16-20,22,23 * abstract *; | [Y]DE10061039 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [Y] 21 * paragraphs [0037] - [0042] - [0045]; figures 2,5 * | International search | [Y]US5997161 (STRINGFELLOW STEVEN ALLEN [US], et al); | [Y]US4849585 (VIDICAN GEORGE [US], et al); | [Y]US5357408 (LECZNAR MARK T [US], et al) |