EP1633913 - UNILAYER FABRIC WITH REINFORCING PARTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.05.2011 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lakeland Industries 711-2 Koehler Ave. Ronkonkoma New York 11779-7410 / US | [2006/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERO, Frederick, A. P.O. Box 2308 Sag Harbor, NY 11963 / US | 02 /
ADAMS, Fred 202 Pride Lane Decatur, AL 35603-1608 / US | [2006/19] |
Former [2006/11] | 01 /
VERO, Frederick, A. P.O. Box 2829 East Hampton, NY 02829 / US | ||
02 /
ADAMS, Fred 202 Pride Lane Decatur, AL 35603-1608 / US | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Bauer Vorberg Kayser Partnerschaft mbB Goltsteinstrasse 87 50968 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/23] | Bauer Vorberg Kayser Patentanwälte Goltsteinstrasse 87 50968 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2006/11] | Axelsson, Nils Ake A.L. Groth & Co.KB P.O. Box 6107 S-102 32 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 03731510.8 | 03.06.2003 | [2006/11] | WO2003US17423 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004109000 | Date: | 16.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1633913 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | D03D15/00 | [2006/11] | CPC: |
D04B1/28 (EP);
D04B7/34 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINSCHICHTIGES GEWEBE MIT VERSTÄRKUNGSELEMENTEN | [2006/11] | English: | UNILAYER FABRIC WITH REINFORCING PARTS | [2006/11] | French: | TEXTILE MONOCOUCHE A PIECES DE RENFORT | [2006/11] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2006 | Search fee paid | 03.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/11] | 03.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/26] | 08.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5965223 |