EP1508249 - SYSTEM AND METHODS FOR REDUCING SATELLITE FEEDER LINK BANDWITH/CARRIERS IN CELLULAR SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ATC Technologies, LLC 10802 Parkridge Boulevard Reston, VA 20191- 5416 / US | [2006/11] |
Former [2005/08] | For all designated states Mobile Satellite Ventures LP 10802 Parkridge Boulevard Reston, VA 20191-5413 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARABINIS, Peter, D. 101 Chalon Drive Cary, NC 27511 / US | [2005/08] | Representative(s) | Palmer, Jonathan R., et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Palmer, Jonathan R., et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2008/51] | Palmer, Jonathan R., et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2005/08] | Hutchinson, Glenn Stanley, et al Harrison Goddard Foote, Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03731543.9 | 28.05.2003 | [2005/08] | WO2003US17614 | Priority number, date | US20020383688P | 28.05.2002 Original published format: US 383688 P | US20020328062 | 23.12.2002 Original published format: US 328062 | [2005/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03101129 | Date: | 04.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1508249 | Date: | 23.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1508249 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/20, H04B7/185 | [2006/42] | CPC: |
H04B7/18515 (EP,US);
H04B7/2121 (EP,US);
H04B7/216 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/08] | H04Q7/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERRINGERUNG DER STRECKENBANDBREITE/TRÄGER EINER SATELLITENZUFÜHRUNG IN ZELLULAREN SYSTEMEN | [2005/08] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHODS FOR REDUCING SATELLITE FEEDER LINK BANDWITH/CARRIERS IN CELLULAR SYSTEMS | [2005/08] | French: | SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES DE REDUCTION DE LA LARGEUR DE BANDE/ DES PORTEUSES DES LIAISONS DE CONNEXION PAR SATELLITES DANS DES SYSTEMES PAR SATELLITES CELLULAIRES | [2005/08] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2004 | Search fee paid | 12.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.07.2004 | Examination requested [2005/08] | 16.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.12.2008 | BE | 17.12.2008 | CY | 17.12.2008 | CZ | 17.12.2008 | DK | 17.12.2008 | EE | 17.12.2008 | FI | 17.12.2008 | NL | 17.12.2008 | RO | 17.12.2008 | SI | 17.12.2008 | SK | 17.12.2008 | TR | 17.12.2008 | BG | 17.03.2009 | GR | 18.03.2009 | ES | 28.03.2009 | PT | 18.05.2009 | IE | 28.05.2009 | LU | 28.05.2009 | CH | 31.05.2009 | LI | 31.05.2009 | MC | 31.05.2009 | HU | 18.06.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2008 | ||
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
SK | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
GR | 18.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
IE | 28.05.2009 | ||
LU | 28.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
HU | 18.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2008 | ||
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
SK | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
GR | 18.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
IE | 28.05.2009 | ||
LU | 28.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2008 | ||
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
SK | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
GR | 18.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
IE | 28.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2008 | ||
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
SK | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
IE | 28.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2008 | ||
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
SK | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2008 | ||
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
SK | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2008 | ||
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
SK | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
SK | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | BE | 17.12.2008 | |
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | BE | 17.12.2008 | |
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | BE | 17.12.2008 | |
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/26] | FI | 17.12.2008 | |
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5903549 (VON DER EMBSE URBAN A [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,12-22,24-26,28,35-42,45-53,56-60 * column 4, line 23 - column 5, line 60; figures 1-2b,8 * * column 2, line 9 - column 3, line 14 * * column 8, line 61 - column 9, line 32 * [Y] 4,6-11,23,27,29-34,43,44,54,55; | [X]US6229986 (WU SHIH-CHANG [US], et al) [X] 1,2,18-21,24,25 * column 1, line 38 - line 44; figures 1,3 * * column 2, line 23 - column 5, line 25 *; | [XDY]US6317583 (WOLCOTT JAMES L [US], et al) [XD] 1,2,18-25,41,52 * abstract * * column 2, line 26 - column 4, line 46 * * column 5, line 60 - line 64 * [Y] 4,23,27; | [X]US6341213 (WU SHIH-CHANG [US]) [X] 1-3,18-22,24-26,41,52 * abstract * * column 5, line 1 - column 8, line 14 *; | [Y]US6377561 (BLACK COLIN J [CA], et al) [Y] 6-11,29-34,43,44,54,55 * column 6, line 22 - column 7, line 50 *; | [PX]WO03026142 (MOBILE SATELLITE VENTURES LP [US], et al) [PX] 1,2,4,18-20,23,52* figure 1; claims 21,22,25 * | International search | [A]US5613193 (ISHIKAWA HIROYASU [JP], et al); | [A]US5638374 (HEATH ROBERT G [US]); | [Y]US5724345 (GUARNERI PAUL JOSEPH [US], et al); | [A]US6150977 (WILCOXSON DONALD C [US], et al); | [Y]US6366776 (WRIGHT DAVID A [US], et al) |