EP1636708 - METHOD AND SYSTEM TO MANAGE A NETWORK CONNECTION APPLICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2013 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ipass Inc. 3800 Bridge Parkway Redwood Shores, CA 94065 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/15] | For all designated states Ipass Inc. 3800 Bridge Parkway Redwood Shores California 94065 / US | ||
Former [2006/12] | For all designated states Ipass Inc. 3800 Bridge Parkway Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUNDER, Singam 539 Issac Court San Jose, CA 95136 / US | 02 /
EDGETT, Jeff Steven 151 S. Bernardo 24 Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | 03 /
ALBERT, Roy David 6529 Fall River Drive San Jose, CA 95120 / US | [2011/43] |
Former [2006/12] | 01 /
SUNDER, Singam 539 Issac Court San Jose, CA 95136 / US | ||
02 /
EDGETT, Jeff, Steven 151 S. Bernardo 24 Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | |||
03 /
ALBERT, Roy, David 6529 Fall River Drive San Jose, CA 95120 / US | Representative(s) | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstraße 4 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/14] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/12] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach Patentanwälte, Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03731585.0 | 05.06.2003 | [2006/12] | WO2003US17914 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004109534 | Date: | 16.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1636708 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1636708 | Date: | 04.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.12.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/16, G06F15/173, H04J3/16, H04L12/28, H04L12/56 | [2010/50] | CPC: |
H04L12/5692 (EP);
H04L12/5691 (EP);
H04L67/306 (EP);
H04L12/14 (EP);
H04L61/45 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/12] | G06F15/16, G06F15/173, H04J3/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR VERWALTUNG EINER NETZWERK-VERBINDUNGSANWENDUNG | [2006/12] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM TO MANAGE A NETWORK CONNECTION APPLICATION | [2006/12] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE GESTION D'UNE APPLICATION DE CONNEXION DE RESEAU | [2006/12] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2006 | Search fee paid | 04.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/12] | 04.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.06.2003 | AT | 04.04.2012 | BE | 04.04.2012 | CY | 04.04.2012 | CZ | 04.04.2012 | DK | 04.04.2012 | EE | 04.04.2012 | FI | 04.04.2012 | IT | 04.04.2012 | NL | 04.04.2012 | RO | 04.04.2012 | SE | 04.04.2012 | SI | 04.04.2012 | SK | 04.04.2012 | TR | 04.04.2012 | IE | 05.06.2012 | LU | 05.06.2012 | CH | 30.06.2012 | LI | 30.06.2012 | MC | 30.06.2012 | BG | 04.07.2012 | GR | 05.07.2012 | ES | 15.07.2012 | PT | 06.08.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
BE | 04.04.2012 | ||
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
IT | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
TR | 04.04.2012 | ||
IE | 05.06.2012 | ||
LU | 05.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
BG | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
ES | 15.07.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
BE | 04.04.2012 | ||
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
IT | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
TR | 04.04.2012 | ||
IE | 05.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
BG | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
ES | 15.07.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
BE | 04.04.2012 | ||
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
IT | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
IE | 05.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
BG | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
ES | 15.07.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
BE | 04.04.2012 | ||
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
IT | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
IE | 05.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
ES | 15.07.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
BE | 04.04.2012 | ||
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
IT | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
IE | 05.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
BE | 04.04.2012 | ||
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
IT | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
BE | 04.04.2012 | ||
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
BE | 04.04.2012 | ||
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
BE | 04.04.2012 | ||
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
BE | 04.04.2012 | ||
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 04.04.2012 | |
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 04.04.2012 | |
SE | 04.04.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9607141 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1-44 * page §6; figure 3 *; | [X]WO9944339 (INDUS RIVER NETWORKS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-44 * page 25, line 13 - page 26, line 6 *; | [A]US6144641 (KAPLAN ALLEN D [US], et al) [A] 1-44 * column 5, lines 15-27 * * column 6, line 29 - column 8, line 29 *; | [X]WO0067435 (KARLSSON MATS [SE], et al) [X] 1-44 * page 21, line 23 - page 22, line 7 *; | [X]US2001034796 (ZEBIAN MARWAN [US]) [X] 1-44 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0223305 (BOS BETTER ONLINE SOLUTION LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1-44* page 20, lines 18-24 *; | [A]WO02096021 (BYTEMOBILE INC [US], et al) [A] 1-44 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2002029275 (SELGAS THOMAS DRENNAN [US], et al); | [A]US2002114346 (LAMPE STEVE C [US], et al); | [A]US6522884 (TENNISON LYNDEN L [US], et al) | by applicant | US2001034796 |