Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008048986 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58699406 | 25.10.2006 | US4378905 | 25.01.2005 | US93119007 | 31.10.2007 | US16725102 | 10.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7646316 | Global Dossier | 12.01.2010 | B2 | US2007042807 | 22.02.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58699406 | 25.10.2006 | US4378905 | 25.01.2005 | US16725102 | 10.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7366552 | Global Dossier | 29.04.2008 | B2 | US2005208983 | 22.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US4378905 | 25.01.2005 | US16725102 | 10.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4393997B | Global Dossier | 06.01.2010 | B2 | JP2005529423 | 29.09.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US0318012 | 06.06.2003 | US16725102 | 10.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003240579B | Global Dossier | 29.11.2007 | B2 | AU2003240579 | 22.12.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0318012 | 06.06.2003 | US16725102 | 10.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1512231 | Global Dossier | 24.03.2010 | A4 | EP1512231 | 09.03.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0318012 | 06.06.2003 | US16725102 | 10.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2488952 | 14.10.2008 | C | CA2488952 | 18.12.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0318012 | 06.06.2003 | US16725102 | 10.06.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03105366 | Global Dossier | 18.12.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16725102 | 10.06.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100438366C | 26.11.2008 | C | CN1675852 | 28.09.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US16725102 | 10.06.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6867965 | 15.03.2005 | B2 | US2003227745 | 11.12.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16725102 | 10.06.2002 |