EP1528963 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A SHAFT COMPRISING STOP CAPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/19] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SHAFT COMPRISING STOP CAPS, AND DEVICE CONTAINING ONE SUCH SHAFT | ||
[2006/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2008 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/18] |
Former [2005/19] | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAUTH, Lothar Konrad-Adenauer-Strasse 11 77815 Buehl / DE | [2005/19] | Application number, filing date | 03732233.6 | 19.05.2003 | [2005/19] | WO2003DE01599 | Priority number, date | DE2002135365 | 02.08.2002 Original published format: DE 10235365 | [2005/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004018122 | Date: | 04.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1528963 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1528963 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B21K1/06, E05F15/16, H02K7/08 | [2005/19] | CPC: |
H02K7/083 (EP,US);
B21K1/06 (EP,US);
E05F15/697 (EP,US);
H02K7/081 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/55 (EP,US);
H02K15/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, IT [2005/47] |
Former [2005/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER WELLE MIT ANLAUFKUPPEN | [2006/47] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A SHAFT COMPRISING STOP CAPS | [2006/47] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION D'UN ARBRE COMPORTANT DES CALOTTES D'APPUI | [2006/47] |
Former [2005/19] | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER WELLE MIT ANLAUFKUPPEN SOWIE VORRICHTUNG BEINHALTEND EINE SOLCHE WELLE | ||
Former [2005/19] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SHAFT COMPRISING STOP CAPS, AND DEVICE CONTAINING ONE SUCH SHAFT | ||
Former [2005/19] | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN ARBRE COMPORTANT DES CALOTTES D'APPUI ET DISPOSITIF CONTENANT UN TEL ARBRE | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/19] | 04.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5127253 (TAKAHARA KATSUO [JP], et al) [X] 1,9 * abstract * * column 1, lines 25-31; figures 17-19 *; | [XDA]WO0165668 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [XD] 1,6-9 * page 5, lines 19-32; figure 2 * [A] 2; | [A]US5845527 (HOFFMANN BENJAMIN R [US], et al) [A] 2-5,10 * abstract * |