EP1502356 - A METHOD OF SOFT-DECISION DECODING OF REED-SOLOMON CODES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2007 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/47] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2005/05] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing S.A. 46, quai A. Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÜLLER, Stefan Chabeuilstr. 1 78087 Mönchweiler / DE | 02 /
KRAVTCHENKO, Alexander Deutenbergring 146 78056 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | 03 /
KABUTZ, Marten Tirolerstr. 23 78052 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [2005/05] | Representative(s) | Thies, Stephan Deutsche Thomson OHG Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/05] | Thies, Stephan Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH, European Patent Operations, Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 03732314.4 | 06.05.2003 | [2005/05] | WO2003EP04689 | Priority number, date | EP20020010430 | 08.05.2002 Original published format: EP 02010430 | [2005/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03096546 | Date: | 20.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1502356 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1502356 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/15 | [2005/05] | CPC: |
H03M13/158 (EP,US);
H03M13/45 (KR);
H03M13/1515 (EP,US);
H03M13/41 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/35] |
Former [2005/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METHODE ZUR DEKODIERUNG VON REED-SOLOMON KODES MITTELS FEINENTSCHEIDUNG | [2005/05] | English: | A METHOD OF SOFT-DECISION DECODING OF REED-SOLOMON CODES | [2005/05] | French: | PROCEDE DE DECODAGE A DECISION SOUPLE DE CODES DE REED-SOLOMON | [2005/05] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/05] | 02.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 22.11.2006 | [2007/40] | Cited in | International search | [AD]US6304994 (OH JI-SUNG [KR], et al) [AD] 1-11 * column 1 - column 5; figures 4-6 *; | [A]US4868828 (SHAO HOWARD M [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 5 - column 16; figures 1,3-6 *; | [AD]US5537426 (LEE DONG H [KR]) [AD] 1-11 * column 1 - column 2; figures 1,2,5,6,10 *; | [A]US6347389 (BOYER KEITH G [US]) [A] 1-11 * column 3 - column 7; figures 1-3 * | [XA] - DONG-SUN KIM ET AL, "Implementation of high speed reed-solomon decoder", PROC. OF 42ND MIDWEST SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, Las Cruces, USA, (19990808), pages 808 - 812, XP010511073 [X] 1-3,5,10,11 * page 808 - page 810; figures 1,6 * [A] 4,6-9 | [XA] - MOON HO LEE ET AL, "A high speed Reed-Solomon decoder", PROC. OF IEEE SIGNAL PROCESSING SOCIETY WORKSHOP, SAKAI, JAPAN, (19950916), ISBN 0-7803-2612-1, pages 362 - 367, XP010193933 [X] 1,4,10,11 * page 362 - page 364; figure 3 * [A] 2,3,5-9 |