EP1519926 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING 3,4-DICHLORO-N-(2-CYANO-PHENYL)-5-ISOTHIAZOLE CARBOXAMIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2006 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, FR | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/14] | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 40789 Monheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIMMLER, Thomas Schöne Aussicht 1B 51519 Odenthal / DE | [2005/14] | Application number, filing date | 03732578.4 | 17.06.2003 | [2005/14] | WO2003EP06360 | Priority number, date | DE2002128732 | 27.06.2002 Original published format: DE 10228732 | [2005/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004002968 | Date: | 08.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1519926 | Date: | 06.04.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1519926 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07D275/03 | [2005/14] | CPC: |
C07D275/03 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 3,4-DICHLOR-N-(2-CYANO-PHENYL)-5-ISOTHIAZOLCARBOXAMID | [2005/14] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING 3,4-DICHLORO-N-(2-CYANO-PHENYL)-5-ISOTHIAZOLE CARBOXAMIDE | [2005/14] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE 3,4-DICHLORO-N-(2-CYANO-PHENYL)-5-ISOTHIAZOLCARBOXAMIDE | [2005/14] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/14] | 22.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.11.2005 | CZ | 02.11.2005 | EE | 02.11.2005 | FI | 02.11.2005 | FR | 02.11.2005 | GB | 02.11.2005 | IE | 02.11.2005 | IT | 02.11.2005 | NL | 02.11.2005 | RO | 02.11.2005 | SI | 02.11.2005 | SK | 02.11.2005 | TR | 02.11.2005 | BG | 02.02.2006 | DK | 02.02.2006 | GR | 02.02.2006 | SE | 02.02.2006 | ES | 13.02.2006 | PT | 03.04.2006 | HU | 03.05.2006 | AT | 17.06.2006 | LU | 17.06.2006 | BE | 30.06.2006 | MC | 30.06.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 02.11.2005 | |
EE | 02.11.2005 | ||
FI | 02.11.2005 | ||
GB | 02.11.2005 | ||
IE | 02.11.2005 | ||
IT | 02.11.2005 | ||
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
RO | 02.11.2005 | ||
SI | 02.11.2005 | ||
SK | 02.11.2005 | ||
TR | 02.11.2005 | ||
BG | 02.02.2006 | ||
DK | 02.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.02.2006 | ||
PT | 03.04.2006 | ||
HU | 03.05.2006 | ||
AT | 17.06.2006 | ||
LU | 17.06.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 02.11.2005 | |
EE | 02.11.2005 | ||
FI | 02.11.2005 | ||
GB | 02.11.2005 | ||
IE | 02.11.2005 | ||
IT | 02.11.2005 | ||
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
RO | 02.11.2005 | ||
SI | 02.11.2005 | ||
SK | 02.11.2005 | ||
BG | 02.02.2006 | ||
DK | 02.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.02.2006 | ||
PT | 03.04.2006 | ||
HU | 03.05.2006 | ||
AT | 17.06.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | CZ | 02.11.2005 | |
FI | 02.11.2005 | ||
GB | 02.11.2005 | ||
IE | 02.11.2005 | ||
IT | 02.11.2005 | ||
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
RO | 02.11.2005 | ||
SI | 02.11.2005 | ||
SK | 02.11.2005 | ||
BG | 02.02.2006 | ||
DK | 02.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.02.2006 | ||
PT | 03.04.2006 | ||
HU | 03.05.2006 | ||
AT | 17.06.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | CZ | 02.11.2005 | |
FI | 02.11.2005 | ||
GB | 02.11.2005 | ||
IE | 02.11.2005 | ||
IT | 02.11.2005 | ||
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
RO | 02.11.2005 | ||
SI | 02.11.2005 | ||
SK | 02.11.2005 | ||
BG | 02.02.2006 | ||
DK | 02.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.02.2006 | ||
PT | 03.04.2006 | ||
HU | 03.05.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/40] | CZ | 02.11.2005 | |
FI | 02.11.2005 | ||
GB | 02.11.2005 | ||
IE | 02.11.2005 | ||
IT | 02.11.2005 | ||
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
SI | 02.11.2005 | ||
SK | 02.11.2005 | ||
BG | 02.02.2006 | ||
DK | 02.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.02.2006 | ||
PT | 03.04.2006 | ||
HU | 03.05.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | CZ | 02.11.2005 | |
FI | 02.11.2005 | ||
GB | 02.11.2005 | ||
IE | 02.11.2005 | ||
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
SI | 02.11.2005 | ||
SK | 02.11.2005 | ||
BG | 02.02.2006 | ||
DK | 02.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.02.2006 | ||
PT | 03.04.2006 | ||
HU | 03.05.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | CZ | 02.11.2005 | |
FI | 02.11.2005 | ||
GB | 02.11.2005 | ||
IE | 02.11.2005 | ||
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
SI | 02.11.2005 | ||
SK | 02.11.2005 | ||
BG | 02.02.2006 | ||
DK | 02.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.02.2006 | ||
PT | 03.04.2006 | ||
HU | 03.05.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | CZ | 02.11.2005 | |
FI | 02.11.2005 | ||
IE | 02.11.2005 | ||
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
SI | 02.11.2005 | ||
SK | 02.11.2005 | ||
BG | 02.02.2006 | ||
DK | 02.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.02.2006 | ||
PT | 03.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | CZ | 02.11.2005 | |
FI | 02.11.2005 | ||
IE | 02.11.2005 | ||
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
SI | 02.11.2005 | ||
SK | 02.11.2005 | ||
BG | 02.02.2006 | ||
DK | 02.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.02.2006 | ||
PT | 03.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | CZ | 02.11.2005 | |
FI | 02.11.2005 | ||
IE | 02.11.2005 | ||
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
SI | 02.11.2005 | ||
SK | 02.11.2005 | ||
BG | 02.02.2006 | ||
DK | 02.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
PT | 03.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | CZ | 02.11.2005 | |
FI | 02.11.2005 | ||
IE | 02.11.2005 | ||
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
SK | 02.11.2005 | ||
BG | 02.02.2006 | ||
DK | 02.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | CZ | 02.11.2005 | |
FI | 02.11.2005 | ||
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
SK | 02.11.2005 | ||
DK | 02.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | CZ | 02.11.2005 | |
FI | 02.11.2005 | ||
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
SK | 02.11.2005 | ||
DK | 02.02.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 02.11.2005 | |
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 02.11.2005 | |
NL | 02.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO9924413 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [AD] 1-7 * abstract * * page 9, line 14 - line 18 * * page 30; example 1 ** claims 1,2 * |