blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1510164

EP1510164 - TOILET BRUSH COMPRISING A CLEANING AND/OR DISINFECTANT PRODUCT DOSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.04.2007
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip20.04.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.05.2007  [2007/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Maximo Gavira, S.A.
Poligono Industrial Campamento
E-11360 San Roque-Cadiz / ES
[2005/09]
Inventor(s)01 / GAVIRA MONTES, Máximo
Poligono Industrial Campamento
E-11360 San Roque-Cádiz / ES
 [2005/09]
Application number, filing date03732596.630.05.2003
[2005/09]
WO2003ES00260
Priority number, dateES2002000128305.06.2002         Original published format: ES 200201283
[2005/09]
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO03103468
Date:18.12.2003
Language:EN
[2003/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1510164
Date:02.03.2005
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2005/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.12.2003
ClassificationIPC:A47K11/10
[2005/09]
CPC:
A46B7/04 (EP,US); A46B11/00 (KR); A47K11/10 (EP,ES,US);
A46B11/0041 (EP,US); A46B11/06 (KR); A46B7/00 (KR);
A46B9/00 (EP,KR,US); A46B2200/304 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/09]
Extension statesAL21.10.2004
LT21.10.2004
LV21.10.2004
MK21.10.2004
TitleGerman:TOILETTENBÜRSTE MIT EINER VORRICHTUNG ZUR DOSIERTEN ABGABE EINES REINIGUNGS- UND/ODER DESINFIZIERUNGSPRODUKTS[2005/09]
English:TOILET BRUSH COMPRISING A CLEANING AND/OR DISINFECTANT PRODUCT DOSING DEVICE[2005/09]
French:BROSSE DE W.-C. MUNI D'UN DISPOSITIF DE DOSAGE DE PRODUITS DE NETTOYAGE ET/OU DESINFECTANTS[2005/09]
Entry into regional phase09.10.2004Translation filed 
21.10.2004National basic fee paid 
21.10.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
21.10.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.11.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.10.2004Examination requested  [2005/09]
01.12.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/21]
10.01.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2007/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200604   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]DE2952612  (DOERKS KLAUS);
 [A]ES1023476U  ;
 [A]DE4224788  (HAEUSER MABEL [DE], et al);
 [A]DE19749511  (ADAMS JOSEF [DE]);
 [A]ES1043513U  (CASTRO CASADO EUGENIO [ES]);
 [A]EP1183980  (ESCAJADILLO SERNA JOSEFINA ANG [ES])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.