EP1517924 - PROCESS FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF N-ACYL-(EPI)K5-AMINE-O-SULFATE-DERIVATIVES AND PRODUCTS THUS OBTAINED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.06.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.07.2006 [2006/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Glycores 2000 S.r.l. Via Mac Mahon, 43 20155 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/13] | For all designated states Glycores 2000 S.R.L. Via Mac Mahon, 43 20155 Milan / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oreste, Pasqua, Anna Via Mac Mahon, 43 20155 Milan / IT | 02 /
Zoppetti, Giorgio Via Mac Mahon 43 20155 Milano / IT | [2005/13] | Representative(s) | Valentini, Giuliano Marietti Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l. Via Larga 16 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/13] | Valentini, Giuliano Marietti Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l. Via Larga 16 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 03732806.9 | 17.06.2003 | [2005/13] | WO2003IB02339 | Priority number, date | IT2002MI01345 | 18.06.2002 Original published format: IT MI20021345 | IT2002MI01346 | 18.06.2002 Original published format: IT MI20021346 | IT2002MI01854 | 27.08.2002 Original published format: IT MI20021854 | [2005/13] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03106505 | Date: | 24.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1517924 | Date: | 30.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C08B37/00, C08B37/08, C08B37/10, A61K31/726, A61K31/727, A61K31/737 | [2005/13] | CPC: |
A61K31/726 (EP,US);
A61K31/727 (EP,US);
A61K31/737 (EP,US);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P17/16 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P39/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07H1/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/13] | Extension states | AL | 07.01.2005 | LT | 07.01.2005 | LV | 07.01.2005 | MK | 07.01.2005 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON N-ACYL-(EPI)K5-AMIN-O-SULFATDERIVATEN UND SO HERGESTELLTE PRODUKTE | [2005/13] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF N-ACYL-(EPI)K5-AMINE-O-SULFATE-DERIVATIVES AND PRODUCTS THUS OBTAINED | [2005/13] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE DERIVES DE N-ACYL-(EPI)K5-AMINE-O-SULFATE ET PRODUITS AINSI OBTENUS | [2005/13] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2003 | Translation filed | 07.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/13] | 07.06.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0489647 (SANOFI ELF [FR]); | [DA]EP0544592 (SANOFI ELF [FR]) [DA] 1,11,14-16,20,26,28,34,45-58 * abstract * * page 10, line 42 - page 12, line 21 * * page 21, line 42 - page 22, line 60 * * examples 4,5 *; | [DA]US5550116 (LORMEAU JEAN CLAUDE [FR], et al) [DA] 1 * examples 6,7 * * column 34, line 27 - column 35, line 65 *; | [DA]WO9743317 (INALCO SPA [IT], et al) [DA] 1,45,58 * page 6, line 27 - page 7, line 2 * * claim - *; | [A]WO9809636 (ISTITUTO SCIENT DI CHIMICA E B [IT], et al) [A] 45-57 * page 3, line 27 - page 5, line 20; example 1 * * claim - *; | [DA]WO9834958 (INALCO SPA [IT], et al) [DA] 22-27,34,38-40,42,43 * page 1, line 25 - page 2, line 22 *; | [AD]WO0172848 (INALCO SPA [IT], et al) [AD] 1,45,58 * page 9, line 30 - page 10, line 4 * * example -; claim - *; | [A] - NAGGI A ET AL, "TOWARD A BIOTECHNOLOGICAL HEPARIN THROUGH COMBINED CHEMICAL AND ENZYMATIC MODIFICATION OF THE ESCHERICHIA COLI K5 POLYSACCHARIDE", SEMINARS IN THROMBOSIS AND HEMOSTASIS, STUTTGART, DE, (2001), vol. 27, no. 5, ISSN 0094-6176, pages 437 - 443, XP008004483 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-2001-17954 |