EP1513883 - A SAFE PROCESS FOR MAKING POLYMERS CONTAINING N-PHENYLIMIDE GROUPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. Via Pergolesi 25 20124 Milano / IT | [2006/02] |
Former [2005/11] | For all designated states Basell Poliolefine Italia S.P.A. Via Pergolesi, 25 20124 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SYED, Abuzar 435 Hillandale Boulevard Torrington, CT 06790 / US | [2005/17] |
Former [2005/11] | 01 /
SYED, Abuzar 614 Pompeii Drive Bear, DE 19701 / US | Representative(s) | Giberti, Stefano, et al Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. Intellectual Property P.le Privato G. Donegani 12 Casella Postale 19 44100 Ferrara / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/11] | Giberti, Stefano, et al Basell Poliolefine Italia S.p.A Intellectual Property P.le G. Donegani 12 44100 Ferrara / IT | Application number, filing date | 03732956.2 | 11.06.2003 | [2005/11] | WO2003IB02683 | Priority number, date | US20020177776 | 20.06.2002 Original published format: US 177776 | [2005/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004000892 | Date: | 31.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2004/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1513883 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1513883 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/00, C08F8/32, C08F222/40, C08L35/06 | [2005/11] | CPC: |
C08F8/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERES VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYMEREN MIT N-PHENYLIMID GRUPPEN | [2005/11] | English: | A SAFE PROCESS FOR MAKING POLYMERS CONTAINING N-PHENYLIMIDE GROUPS | [2005/11] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION EN TOUTE SECURITE DE POLYMERES CONTENANT DES GROUPES N-PHENYLIMIDE | [2005/11] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/11] | 12.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.04.2006 | BE | 12.04.2006 | CH | 12.04.2006 | CY | 12.04.2006 | CZ | 12.04.2006 | EE | 12.04.2006 | FI | 12.04.2006 | LI | 12.04.2006 | NL | 12.04.2006 | RO | 12.04.2006 | SI | 12.04.2006 | SK | 12.04.2006 | TR | 12.04.2006 | LU | 11.06.2006 | IE | 12.06.2006 | MC | 30.06.2006 | BG | 12.07.2006 | DK | 12.07.2006 | SE | 12.07.2006 | GR | 13.07.2006 | ES | 23.07.2006 | PT | 12.09.2006 | HU | 13.10.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 12.04.2006 | |
BE | 12.04.2006 | ||
CH | 12.04.2006 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2006 | ||
EE | 12.04.2006 | ||
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
LI | 12.04.2006 | ||
NL | 12.04.2006 | ||
RO | 12.04.2006 | ||
SI | 12.04.2006 | ||
SK | 12.04.2006 | ||
TR | 12.04.2006 | ||
LU | 11.06.2006 | ||
IE | 12.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
BG | 12.07.2006 | ||
DK | 12.07.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
GR | 13.07.2006 | ||
ES | 23.07.2006 | ||
PT | 12.09.2006 | ||
HU | 13.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 12.04.2006 | |
BE | 12.04.2006 | ||
CH | 12.04.2006 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2006 | ||
EE | 12.04.2006 | ||
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
LI | 12.04.2006 | ||
NL | 12.04.2006 | ||
RO | 12.04.2006 | ||
SI | 12.04.2006 | ||
SK | 12.04.2006 | ||
IE | 12.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
BG | 12.07.2006 | ||
DK | 12.07.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
GR | 13.07.2006 | ||
ES | 23.07.2006 | ||
PT | 12.09.2006 | ||
HU | 13.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/31] | AT | 12.04.2006 | |
BE | 12.04.2006 | ||
CH | 12.04.2006 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2006 | ||
EE | 12.04.2006 | ||
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
LI | 12.04.2006 | ||
NL | 12.04.2006 | ||
RO | 12.04.2006 | ||
SI | 12.04.2006 | ||
SK | 12.04.2006 | ||
IE | 12.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
BG | 12.07.2006 | ||
DK | 12.07.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
GR | 13.07.2006 | ||
ES | 23.07.2006 | ||
PT | 12.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 12.04.2006 | |
BE | 12.04.2006 | ||
CH | 12.04.2006 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2006 | ||
EE | 12.04.2006 | ||
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
LI | 12.04.2006 | ||
NL | 12.04.2006 | ||
RO | 12.04.2006 | ||
SI | 12.04.2006 | ||
SK | 12.04.2006 | ||
IE | 12.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 12.07.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
GR | 13.07.2006 | ||
ES | 23.07.2006 | ||
PT | 12.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 12.04.2006 | |
BE | 12.04.2006 | ||
CH | 12.04.2006 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2006 | ||
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
LI | 12.04.2006 | ||
NL | 12.04.2006 | ||
RO | 12.04.2006 | ||
SI | 12.04.2006 | ||
SK | 12.04.2006 | ||
IE | 12.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 12.07.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
GR | 13.07.2006 | ||
ES | 23.07.2006 | ||
PT | 12.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 12.04.2006 | |
BE | 12.04.2006 | ||
CH | 12.04.2006 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2006 | ||
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
LI | 12.04.2006 | ||
NL | 12.04.2006 | ||
RO | 12.04.2006 | ||
SI | 12.04.2006 | ||
SK | 12.04.2006 | ||
IE | 12.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 12.07.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
ES | 23.07.2006 | ||
PT | 12.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 12.04.2006 | |
BE | 12.04.2006 | ||
CH | 12.04.2006 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2006 | ||
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
IT | 12.04.2006 | ||
LI | 12.04.2006 | ||
NL | 12.04.2006 | ||
RO | 12.04.2006 | ||
SI | 12.04.2006 | ||
SK | 12.04.2006 | ||
IE | 12.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 12.07.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
ES | 23.07.2006 | ||
PT | 12.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/40] | AT | 12.04.2006 | |
BE | 12.04.2006 | ||
CH | 12.04.2006 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2006 | ||
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
IT | 12.04.2006 | ||
LI | 12.04.2006 | ||
NL | 12.04.2006 | ||
SI | 12.04.2006 | ||
SK | 12.04.2006 | ||
IE | 12.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 12.07.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
ES | 23.07.2006 | ||
PT | 12.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | AT | 12.04.2006 | |
BE | 12.04.2006 | ||
CH | 12.04.2006 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2006 | ||
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
LI | 12.04.2006 | ||
NL | 12.04.2006 | ||
SI | 12.04.2006 | ||
SK | 12.04.2006 | ||
IE | 12.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 12.07.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
ES | 23.07.2006 | ||
PT | 12.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 12.04.2006 | |
BE | 12.04.2006 | ||
CH | 12.04.2006 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2006 | ||
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
LI | 12.04.2006 | ||
NL | 12.04.2006 | ||
SI | 12.04.2006 | ||
SK | 12.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 12.07.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
ES | 23.07.2006 | ||
PT | 12.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | AT | 12.04.2006 | |
BE | 12.04.2006 | ||
CH | 12.04.2006 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2006 | ||
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
LI | 12.04.2006 | ||
SI | 12.04.2006 | ||
SK | 12.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 12.07.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
ES | 23.07.2006 | ||
PT | 12.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | AT | 12.04.2006 | |
CH | 12.04.2006 | ||
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
LI | 12.04.2006 | ||
SI | 12.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 12.07.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
ES | 23.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 12.04.2006 | |
CH | 12.04.2006 | ||
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
LI | 12.04.2006 | ||
SI | 12.04.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
ES | 23.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/01] | AT | 12.04.2006 | |
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
SI | 12.04.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
ES | 23.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SI | 12.04.2006 | |
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
ES | 23.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SI | 12.04.2006 | |
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | SI | 12.04.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0076691 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [A] 1-5* whole document * |