EP1523135 - OPTIMIZATION OF PACKET TRANSMISSION PATH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2017 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] | 27.01.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] | 27.01.2017 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/15] | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUNAGA, Yasuhiko c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2005/15] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/15] | Glawe. Delfs. Moll Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03733024.8 | 21.05.2003 | [2005/15] | WO2003JP06340 | Priority number, date | JP20020147275 | 22.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002147275 | [2005/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03098885 | Date: | 27.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1523135 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.11.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56, H04Q7/38, H04L29/06 | [2005/46] | CPC: |
H04L45/12 (EP,US);
H04W40/04 (KR);
H04L45/00 (US);
H04L12/28 (KR);
H04L63/08 (EP,US);
H04W12/03 (EP,US);
H04W28/06 (KR);
H04W40/02 (EP,US);
H04L45/04 (US);
|
Former IPC [2005/15] | H04L12/56, H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/37] |
Former [2005/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | PAKETEN ÜBERTRAGUNGSPFADES OPTIMIERUNG | [2005/15] | English: | OPTIMIZATION OF PACKET TRANSMISSION PATH | [2005/15] | French: | OPTIMISATION DU TRAJET DE TRANSMISSION DES PAQUETS | [2005/15] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2004 | Translation filed | 08.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2004 | Search fee paid | 08.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 08.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/15] | 08.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/09] | 26.01.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 31.01.2017 | 31.01.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | EP10009795.5 / EP2288093 | EP17153058.7 / EP3176993 | EP19195354.6 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.08.2006 | Request for further processing for: | 25.05.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 25.05.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.06.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 26.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY] - PERKINS C, "RFC 3220: IP Mobility Support for IPv4", IETF RFC, (20020131), XP002288705 [DY] 1-4,11-15 * paragraph [2.3.FOREIGN.AGENT.AND.HOME.AGENT.CONSIDERATIONS] * * paragraph [2.4.MOBILE.NODE.CONSIDERATIONS] * * paragraph [3.REGISTRATION] * * paragraph [4.ROUING.CONSIDERATIONS] * | [DY] - "Digital cellular telecommunications system (Phase 2+) (GSM); Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); General Packet Radio Service (GPRS) Service description; Stage 2 (3GPP TS 23.060 version 3.11.0 Release 1999); ETSI TS 123 060", ETSI STANDARDS, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE, SOPHIA-ANTIPO, FR, (200203), vol. 3-SA2, no. V3110, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014007556 [DY] 1-4,10,13-15 * paragraph [4.MAIN.CONCEPTS] * * paragraph [5.GENERAL.PACKET.DOMAIN.ARCHITECTURE] * * paragraph [ANNEX.A.APN.AND.GGSN.SELECTION] * | [DY] - MOY J, "OSPF VERSION 2", IETF RFC, (199804), XP002234813 [DY] 1-4,10-15 * paragraph [1.1.PROTOCOL.OVERVIEW] * * paragraph [1.3.BRIEF.HISTORY.OFLINK.STATE.ROUTING.TECHNOLOGY] * * paragraph [2.2.THE.SHORTEST.PATH.TREE] * | [A] - JOHNSON D B ET AL, "PROTOCOLS FOR ADAPTIVE WIRELESS AND MOBILE NETWORKING", IEEE PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE COMMUNICATIONS SOCIETY, US, (19960201), vol. 3, no. 1, ISSN 1070-9916, pages 34 - 42, XP000554691 [A] 1-4 * page 2 - page 4; figure 1 * * page 5 - page 7; figures 3,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/98.486974 | [X] - S. RAMANATHAN AND MARTHA STEENSTRUP, "A survey of routing techniques for mobile communications networks", MOBILE NETWORKS AND APPLICATIONS, (199610), vol. 1, no. 2, pages 89 - 104, XP002361951 [X] 5-9,16-20 * page 95, column L, paragraph LAST - column R, paragraph FIRST * * paragraph [4.1.3.INTERNETWORKS] * * paragraph [4.2.MOBILE.INFRASTRUCTURE] * * paragraph [4.2.4.ALTERNATE.ROUTES] * * paragraph [4.2.5.HIERARCHICAL.ROUTING] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01193330 | [X] - RAMJEE R ET AL, "PERFORMANCE EVALUATION OF CONNECTION REROUTING SCHEMES FOR ATM- BASED WIRELESS NETWORKS", IEEE / ACM TRANSACTIONS ON NETWORKING, IEEE / ACM, NEW YORK, NY, US, (199806), vol. 6, no. 3, ISSN 1063-6692, pages 249 - 261, XP000755004 [X] 5-9,16-20 * page 251, column R * * paragraph [B.CHAINING.WITH.BREAK.MAKE.AND.MAKE.BREAK] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/90.700889 | [X] - A. MYLES AND D. SKELLERN, "Comparing Four IP Based Mobile Host Protocols", COMPUTER NETWORKS AND ISDN SYSTEMS, (1993), URL: citeseer.ist.psu.edu/myles93comparing.html, (20060105), XP002361952 [X] 5,16 * paragraph [SONY.MHP] * * paragraph [IBMI.MHP] * * paragraph [IBMII.MHP] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0169-7552(93)90013-T | [X] - RACHERLA G ET AL, "A distributed rerouting algorithm for mobile-mobile connections in connection-oriented networks", COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKS, 1998. PROCEEDINGS. 7TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON LAFAYETTE, LA, USA 12-15 OCT. 1998, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19981012), ISBN 0-8186-9014-3, pages 40 - 44, XP010587021 [X] 8,17 * paragraph [3.PROPOSED.ALGORITHM.FOR.MOBILE.MOBILE.REROUTING] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCCN.1998.739896 | [X] - PERKINS C ET AL, "Route Optimization in Mobile IP: draft-ietf-mobileip-optim-11.txt", INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE INTERNET DRAFT, XX, XX, (20010906), pages 1 - 25, XP002234531 [X] 5,16 * paragraph [3.1.BINDING.CACHE] * * paragraph [4.ROUTE.OPTIMIZATION.MESSAGE.FORMATS] * * paragraph [6.1.PREVIOUS.FOREIGN.AGENT.NOTIFICATION.EXTENSION] * | International search | [Y]JPH10243440 (Y R P IDO TSUSHIN KIBAN GIJUTS); | [Y]WO0076234 (NOKIA NETWORKS OY [FI], et al); | [Y]JP2001016258 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]WO0106732 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB], et al); | [A]WO0139525 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI], et al); | [AP]JP2002185500 (NEC CORP); | [AE]JP2003224589 (NTT DOCOMO INC) |