EP1512996 - MATERIAL FOR SUBSTRATE MOUNTING OPTICAL CIRCUIT-ELECTRIC CIRCUIT MIXEDLY AND SUBSTRATE MOUNTING OPTICAL CIRCUIT-ELECTRIC CIRCUIT MIXEDLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2015 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | 18.12.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.01.2016 [2016/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2015/13] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
Former [2015/12] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
Former [2012/11] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2009/08] | For all designated states Panasonic Electric Works Co., Ltd. 1048 Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka / JP | ||
Former [2005/10] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu 571-8686 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKASHIBA, Tooru, MATSUSHITA ELEC. WORKS, LTD. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | 02 /
KOTERA, Kouhei, MATSUSHITA ELEC. WORKS, LTD. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | 03 /
MATSUSHIMA, Tomoaki, MATSUSHITA ELEC. WORKS, LTD. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | 04 /
MATSUSHITA, Yukio, MATSUSHITA ELEC. WORKS, LTD. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | 05 /
NAKANISHI, Hideo, MATSUSHITA ELEC. WORKS, LTD. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | 06 /
HASHIMOTO, Shinji, MATSUSHITA ELEC. WORKS, LTD. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | 07 /
NEMOTO, Tomoaki, MATSUSHITA ELEC. WORKS, LTD. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | 08 /
YAGYU, Hiroyuki, MATSUSHITA ELEC. WORKS, LTD. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | 09 /
KASAI, Yuuki, MATSUSHITA ELEC. WORKS, LTD. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | [2005/10] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2009/29] | von Kreisler, Alek Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2005/10] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem. Deichmannhaus am Dom, Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 03733077.6 | 27.05.2003 | [2005/10] | WO2003JP06569 | Priority number, date | JP20020154809 | 28.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002154809 | JP20020154810 | 28.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002154810 | [2005/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03100486 | Date: | 04.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1512996 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/13 | [2005/10] | CPC: |
G02B6/43 (EP,US);
G02B6/13 (EP,KR,US);
B32B15/08 (EP,US);
G02B6/12004 (EP,US);
G02B6/138 (EP,US);
H05K1/0274 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0108 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0195 (EP,US);
H05K3/386 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MATERIAL FÜR EINE GEMISCHT OPTISCHE/ ELEKTRISCHE SUBSTRATANBRINGUNGS-SCHALTUNG UND SUBSTRATANBRINGUNG FÜR EINE GEMISCHT OPTISCHE/ ELEKTRISCHE SCHALTUNG | [2005/10] | English: | MATERIAL FOR SUBSTRATE MOUNTING OPTICAL CIRCUIT-ELECTRIC CIRCUIT MIXEDLY AND SUBSTRATE MOUNTING OPTICAL CIRCUIT-ELECTRIC CIRCUIT MIXEDLY | [2005/10] | French: | MATERIAU POUR LE MONTAGE MIXTE DE SUBSTRAT DE CIRCUIT OPTIQUE/CIRCUIT ELECTRIQUE ET MONTAGE MIXTE DE SUBSTRAT DE CIRCUIT OPTIQUE/CIRCUIT ELECTRIQUE | [2005/10] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2004 | Translation filed | 21.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2004 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/10] | 24.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/03] | 16.12.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.03.2016 | 03.03.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.05.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4376160 (EVANCHUK VINCENT L) [Y] 8-14 * column 2, line 53 - column 4, line 21 * * figures 1-5 *; | [X]GB2191603 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD) [X] 1-4 * page 1, lines 38-126 * * figures 1-3 *; | [XY]US5054872 (FAN BUNSEN [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * column 9, lines 50-55 * * column 10, line 51 - column 13, line 25 * * figures 1a-1e,2a-2f * [Y] 8-28; | [A]EP0687925 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 6 * column 6, lines 9-24 *; | [A]EP0717294 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRONIC COMPON [JP]) [A] 25 * page 15, lines 26-51 ** table 1 *; | [A]JPH09281352 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [A] 15,17,26,27 * paragraph [0015] * * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]EP1041418 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 15-28 * paragraphs [0064] - [0081] * * paragraphs [0365] - [0374] * * figures 1,5A-5O,36A-36H *; | [A]US2002051599 (TSUKAMOTO TAKEHITO [JP], et al) [A] 15,17,26,27 * paragraphs [0050] - [0066] * * figures 1-4 * | International search | [A]JPH06281831 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [Y]JPH10232323 (HITACHI CABLE); | [A]JP2000180643 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [A]JP2000298217 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [A]JP2000321455 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC); | [A]JP2000340957 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [A]JP2001166165 (HITACHI CABLE); | [A]JP2001196494 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [A]JP2002006161 (SONY CORP); | [Y]JP2002053667 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP); | [XP]JP2003057478 (HITACHI CABLE); | [X] - KATSUYUKI IMOTO ET AL., "Photo-bleaching-yo polymer zairyo o mochiita doharo kozo oyobi sono seizo hoho no ichikento (photo-bleaching type waveguide and its fabrication method)", 2002 NEN, THE INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS, INFORMATION AND COMMUNICATION ENGINEERS SOGO TAIKAI, B-10-82, (2002), page 519, XP002970437 | [X] - KATSUYUKI IMOTO ET AL., "Photo-bleaching-yo polymer zairyo oyobi sore o mochiita doharo kozo to sono seizo hoho no kento (optical waveguide structure and its fabrication method with a novel photobleaching type polymeric material)", THE INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS, INFORMATION AND COMMUNICATION ENGINEERS GIJUTSU KENKYU HOKOKU (OME2002 13-19), (2002), vol. 102, no. 47, pages 25 - 30, XP002970438 | Examination | US3486934 | DE2710074 | JPH06281831 | US5572619 |