EP1470054 - COMPOSITE CLOSURE HAVING DISK TIGHTENING FEATURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: TR | published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Crown Packaging Technology, Inc 11535 South Central Avenue Alsip, IL 60803-2599 / US | [2004/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GERMAN, Galen 1668 Ridgeview Court Lancaster, OH 43130 / US | 02 /
MARTIN, James, L. 820 King Street Lancaster, OH 43130 / US | [2004/44] | Representative(s) | Ratliff, Ismay Hilary, et al CROWN Packaging UK plc, Downsview Road Wantage Oxon, OX12 9BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/44] | Ratliff, Ismay Hilary, et al CROWN Packaging UK plc, Downsview Road Wantage, Oxon, OX12 9BP / GB | Application number, filing date | 03734665.7 | 10.01.2003 | [2004/44] | WO2003EP00275 | Priority number, date | US20020062115 | 31.01.2002 Original published format: US 62115 | [2004/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03064276 | Date: | 07.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1470054 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1470054 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65D51/14 | [2004/44] | CPC: |
B65D41/3423 (EP,US);
B65D51/145 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBUNDVERSCHLUSS MIT SCHEIBENFESTSPANNMERKMAL | [2004/44] | English: | COMPOSITE CLOSURE HAVING DISK TIGHTENING FEATURE | [2004/44] | French: | FERMETURE COMPOSITE MUNIE D'UN ELEMENT DE FIXATION DE DISQUE | [2004/44] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/44] | 20.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.12.2005 | EE | 07.12.2005 | LU | 31.01.2006 | MC | 31.01.2006 | [2016/07] |
Former [2009/43] | CY | 07.12.2005 | |
EE | 07.12.2005 | ||
TR | 07.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2009/02] | CY | 07.12.2005 | |
EE | 07.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | EE | 07.12.2005 | |
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | LU | 31.01.2006 | |
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2007/40] | IT | 07.12.2005 | |
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | LU | 31.01.2006 | |
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/44] | MC | 31.01.2006 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4705183 (MOLONEY JOHN J [US]) [Y] 1-5,9-12 * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 43; figure 4 *; | [A]US4748735 (HAYES THOMAS H [US]) [A] 1-12 * column 2, line 28 - column 3, line 17; figure 2 *; | [Y]EP0280024 (EBERHARDT HEINRICH) [Y] 1-5,9-12 * column 4, line 50 - column 5, line 35; figure 2 *; | [A]WO9923007 (CROWN CORK & SEAL TECH CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 6, line 28 - page 7, line 9; figure 3 *; | [AD]US6220466 (HAYES THOMAS H [US], et al) [AD] 1-12* column 3, line 29 - column 5, line 22; figures 1-3 * |