EP1493081 - DATA TRANSFER MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/44] | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | ||
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states INTEL CORPORATION 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADILETTA, Matthew 20 Monticello Drive Worcester, MA 01603 / US | 02 /
BERNSTEIN, Debra 443 Peakham Road Sudbury, MA 01776 / US | 03 /
ROSENBLUTH, Mark 4 Crestview Drive Uxbridge, MA 01569 / US | 04 /
WOLRICH, Gilbert 4 Cider Mill Road Framingham, MA 01701 / US | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher R G C Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03734963.6 | 16.01.2003 | [2005/01] | WO2003US01579 | Priority number, date | US20020057738 | 25.01.2002 Original published format: US 57738 | [2005/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03065205 | Date: | 07.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1493081 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1493081 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/38, G06F13/16 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
G06F9/3824 (EP,US);
G06F13/38 (KR);
G06F9/3851 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATENTRANSFERMECHANISMUS | [2005/01] | English: | DATA TRANSFER MECHANISM | [2005/01] | French: | SYSTEME DE TRANSFERT DE DONNEES | [2005/01] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.10.2003 | Examination requested [2005/01] | 14.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.11.2010 | BE | 03.11.2010 | CY | 03.11.2010 | CZ | 03.11.2010 | DK | 03.11.2010 | EE | 03.11.2010 | FI | 03.11.2010 | HU | 03.11.2010 | IT | 03.11.2010 | NL | 03.11.2010 | SE | 03.11.2010 | SI | 03.11.2010 | SK | 03.11.2010 | TR | 03.11.2010 | IE | 16.01.2011 | LU | 16.01.2011 | CH | 31.01.2011 | FR | 31.01.2011 | LI | 31.01.2011 | MC | 31.01.2011 | BG | 03.02.2011 | GB | 03.02.2011 | GR | 04.02.2011 | ES | 14.02.2011 | PT | 03.03.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
CY | 03.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IT | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
TR | 03.11.2010 | ||
IE | 16.01.2011 | ||
LU | 16.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
FR | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GB | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
CY | 03.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IT | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
IE | 16.01.2011 | ||
LU | 16.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
FR | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GB | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IT | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
IE | 16.01.2011 | ||
LU | 16.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
FR | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GB | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IT | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
IE | 16.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
FR | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GB | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IT | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
IE | 16.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
FR | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IT | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
FR | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
FR | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | FI | 03.11.2010 | |
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 |