EP1511643 - HEATING DEVICE FOR MOTOR VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2006 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, FR | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Behr GmbH & Co. Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2005/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AUGENSTEIN, Claus Hoffmannstrasse 176 71229 Leonberg / DE | 02 /
MAUS, Ralf Carl-Peters-Strasse 17 70825 Korntal-Münchingen / DE | [2005/10] | Representative(s) | Grauel, Andreas BEHR GmbH & Co., Intellectual Property Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/10] | Grauel, Andreas, Dr. BEHR GmbH & Co., Intellectual Property, Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 03735362.0 | 07.05.2003 | [2005/10] | WO2003EP04763 | Priority number, date | DE2002122947 | 24.05.2002 Original published format: DE 10222947 | [2005/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03099596 | Date: | 04.12.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1511643 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1511643 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/03, F24J3/00 | [2005/10] | CPC: |
B60H1/038 (EP,US);
F24V40/00 (EP,US);
B60H2001/146 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HEIZVORRICHTUNG FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE | [2005/10] | English: | HEATING DEVICE FOR MOTOR VEHICLES | [2005/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CHAUFFAGE POUR DES VEHICULES AUTOMOBILES | [2005/10] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/10] | 18.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.09.2005 | CZ | 28.09.2005 | EE | 28.09.2005 | FI | 28.09.2005 | FR | 28.09.2005 | GB | 28.09.2005 | IE | 28.09.2005 | IT | 28.09.2005 | NL | 28.09.2005 | RO | 28.09.2005 | SI | 28.09.2005 | SK | 28.09.2005 | TR | 28.09.2005 | BG | 28.12.2005 | DK | 28.12.2005 | GR | 28.12.2005 | SE | 28.12.2005 | ES | 08.01.2006 | PT | 28.02.2006 | HU | 29.03.2006 | AT | 07.05.2006 | LU | 07.05.2006 | BE | 31.05.2006 | MC | 31.05.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 28.09.2005 | |
EE | 28.09.2005 | ||
FI | 28.09.2005 | ||
GB | 28.09.2005 | ||
IE | 28.09.2005 | ||
IT | 28.09.2005 | ||
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
RO | 28.09.2005 | ||
SI | 28.09.2005 | ||
SK | 28.09.2005 | ||
TR | 28.09.2005 | ||
BG | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.12.2005 | ||
ES | 08.01.2006 | ||
PT | 28.02.2006 | ||
HU | 29.03.2006 | ||
AT | 07.05.2006 | ||
LU | 07.05.2006 | ||
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 28.09.2005 | |
EE | 28.09.2005 | ||
FI | 28.09.2005 | ||
GB | 28.09.2005 | ||
IE | 28.09.2005 | ||
IT | 28.09.2005 | ||
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
RO | 28.09.2005 | ||
SI | 28.09.2005 | ||
SK | 28.09.2005 | ||
BG | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.12.2005 | ||
ES | 08.01.2006 | ||
PT | 28.02.2006 | ||
HU | 29.03.2006 | ||
AT | 07.05.2006 | ||
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/47] | CZ | 28.09.2005 | |
FI | 28.09.2005 | ||
GB | 28.09.2005 | ||
IE | 28.09.2005 | ||
IT | 28.09.2005 | ||
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
RO | 28.09.2005 | ||
SI | 28.09.2005 | ||
SK | 28.09.2005 | ||
BG | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.12.2005 | ||
ES | 08.01.2006 | ||
PT | 28.02.2006 | ||
HU | 29.03.2006 | ||
AT | 07.05.2006 | ||
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | CZ | 28.09.2005 | |
FI | 28.09.2005 | ||
GB | 28.09.2005 | ||
IE | 28.09.2005 | ||
IT | 28.09.2005 | ||
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
RO | 28.09.2005 | ||
SI | 28.09.2005 | ||
SK | 28.09.2005 | ||
BG | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.12.2005 | ||
ES | 08.01.2006 | ||
PT | 28.02.2006 | ||
HU | 29.03.2006 | ||
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/40] | CZ | 28.09.2005 | |
FI | 28.09.2005 | ||
GB | 28.09.2005 | ||
IE | 28.09.2005 | ||
IT | 28.09.2005 | ||
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
SI | 28.09.2005 | ||
SK | 28.09.2005 | ||
BG | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.12.2005 | ||
ES | 08.01.2006 | ||
PT | 28.02.2006 | ||
HU | 29.03.2006 | ||
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | CZ | 28.09.2005 | |
FI | 28.09.2005 | ||
GB | 28.09.2005 | ||
IE | 28.09.2005 | ||
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
SI | 28.09.2005 | ||
SK | 28.09.2005 | ||
BG | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.12.2005 | ||
ES | 08.01.2006 | ||
PT | 28.02.2006 | ||
HU | 29.03.2006 | ||
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | CZ | 28.09.2005 | |
FI | 28.09.2005 | ||
GB | 28.09.2005 | ||
IE | 28.09.2005 | ||
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
SI | 28.09.2005 | ||
SK | 28.09.2005 | ||
BG | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.12.2005 | ||
ES | 08.01.2006 | ||
PT | 28.02.2006 | ||
HU | 29.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | CZ | 28.09.2005 | |
FI | 28.09.2005 | ||
IE | 28.09.2005 | ||
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
SI | 28.09.2005 | ||
SK | 28.09.2005 | ||
BG | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.12.2005 | ||
ES | 08.01.2006 | ||
PT | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | CZ | 28.09.2005 | |
FI | 28.09.2005 | ||
IE | 28.09.2005 | ||
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
SI | 28.09.2005 | ||
SK | 28.09.2005 | ||
BG | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.12.2005 | ||
ES | 08.01.2006 | ||
PT | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | CZ | 28.09.2005 | |
FI | 28.09.2005 | ||
IE | 28.09.2005 | ||
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
SI | 28.09.2005 | ||
SK | 28.09.2005 | ||
BG | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.12.2005 | ||
PT | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | CZ | 28.09.2005 | |
FI | 28.09.2005 | ||
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
SI | 28.09.2005 | ||
SK | 28.09.2005 | ||
BG | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.12.2005 | ||
PT | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/29] | CZ | 28.09.2005 | |
FI | 28.09.2005 | ||
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
SI | 28.09.2005 | ||
SK | 28.09.2005 | ||
BG | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.12.2005 | ||
PT | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | CZ | 28.09.2005 | |
FI | 28.09.2005 | ||
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
SI | 28.09.2005 | ||
BG | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.12.2005 | ||
PT | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 28.09.2005 | |
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
SI | 28.09.2005 | ||
BG | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.12.2005 | ||
PT | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/22] | FI | 28.09.2005 | |
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
SI | 28.09.2005 | ||
BG | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 28.09.2005 | |
SI | 28.09.2005 | ||
BG | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 28.09.2005 | |
SI | 28.09.2005 | ||
BG | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.12.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4501231 (PERKINS EUGENE W [US]) [A] 1-13* column 1, lines 50-66; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]DE19631722 (SUSPA COMPART AG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * columns 3-5; figures 1,2; claim - *; | [A]DE19906361 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * figure 2; claim - * |