EP1525241 - STRUCTURALLY VISCOUS CLEAR LACQUER SLURRY, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF, AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Coatings AG Glasuritstrasse 1 48165 Münster / DE | [2005/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLORACK, Heike Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 2 48565 Steinfurt / DE | 02 /
RÖCKRATH, Ulrike Vikarsbusch 8 48308 Senden / DE | 03 /
BÖHMER, Ute Jenfelder Strasse 250b 22045 Hamburg / DE | 04 /
TECKLENBORG, Michael Dr. Metzger-Weg 18 48317 Drensteinfurt / DE | 05 /
WOLTERING, Joachim Althausweg 121 48159 Münster / DE | 06 /
GIESEN, Bianca Bahnhofsstr. 19 59065 Hamm / DE | [2006/18] |
Former [2006/17] | 01 /
FLORACK, Heike Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 2 48565 Steinfurt / DE | ||
02 /
RÖCKRATH, Ulrike Vikarsbusch 8 48308 Senden / DE | |||
03 /
BÖHMER, Ute Jenfelder Strasse 250b 22045 Hamburg / DE | |||
04 /
TECKLENBORG, Michael Deventerweg 17 48317 Drensteinfurt / DE | |||
05 /
WOLTERING, Joachim Althausweg 121 48159 Münster / DE | |||
06 /
GIESEN, Bianca Bahnhofsstr. 19 59065 Hamm / DE | |||
Former [2005/17] | 01 /
FLORACK, Heike von-Schonebeck-Ring 71 48161 Münster / DE | ||
02 /
RÖCKRATH, Ulrike Vikarsbusch 8 48308 Senden / DE | |||
03 /
BÖHMER, Ute Jenfelder Strasse 250b 22045 Hamburg / DE | |||
04 /
TECKLENBORG, Michael Deventerweg 17 48317 Drensteinfurt / DE | |||
05 /
WOLTERING, Joachim Althausweg 121 48159 Münster / DE | |||
06 /
GIESEN, Bianca Bahnhofsstr. 19 59065 Hamm / DE | Representative(s) | Leifert, Elmar Leifert & Steffan Patentanwälte Postfach 10 40 09 40031 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/02] | Leifert, Elmar Leifert & Steffan Burgplatz 21-22 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2006/33] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2005/17] | Fitzner, Uwe, Dr. Lintorfer Strasse 10 40878 Ratingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03735549.2 | 05.06.2003 | [2005/17] | WO2003EP05888 | Priority number, date | DE20021034792 | 31.07.2002 Original published format: DE 10234792 | [2005/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004018537 | Date: | 04.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1525241 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1525241 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/08, C08G18/62 | [2005/17] | CPC: |
C08G18/0823 (EP);
C08G18/6254 (EP);
C08G18/807 (EP);
C09D175/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STRUKTURVISKOSE KLARLACK-SLURRY, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2005/17] | English: | STRUCTURALLY VISCOUS CLEAR LACQUER SLURRY, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF, AND USE THEREOF | [2005/17] | French: | SUSPENSION DE VERNIS CLAIR A VISCOSITE INTRINSEQUE, PROCEDE POUR LA PRODUIRE ET SON UTILISATION | [2005/17] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/17] | 08.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 12.11.2008 | CZ | 12.11.2008 | DK | 12.11.2008 | EE | 12.11.2008 | FI | 12.11.2008 | IE | 12.11.2008 | IT | 12.11.2008 | NL | 12.11.2008 | RO | 12.11.2008 | SI | 12.11.2008 | SK | 12.11.2008 | TR | 12.11.2008 | BG | 12.02.2009 | SE | 12.02.2009 | GR | 13.02.2009 | ES | 23.02.2009 | PT | 13.04.2009 | AT | 05.06.2009 | GB | 05.06.2009 | LU | 05.06.2009 | BE | 30.06.2009 | CH | 30.06.2009 | FR | 30.06.2009 | LI | 30.06.2009 | MC | 30.06.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/21] | CZ | 12.11.2008 | |
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
IT | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
GR | 13.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
AT | 05.06.2009 | ||
GB | 05.06.2009 | ||
LU | 05.06.2009 | ||
BE | 30.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
FR | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | CZ | 12.11.2008 | |
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
IT | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
GR | 13.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
AT | 05.06.2009 | ||
GB | 05.06.2009 | ||
BE | 30.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
FR | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | CZ | 12.11.2008 | |
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
GR | 13.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
AT | 05.06.2009 | ||
GB | 05.06.2009 | ||
BE | 30.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
FR | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/37] | CZ | 12.11.2008 | |
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
AT | 05.06.2009 | ||
GB | 05.06.2009 | ||
BE | 30.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
FR | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | CZ | 12.11.2008 | |
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
GB | 05.06.2009 | ||
BE | 30.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
FR | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CZ | 12.11.2008 | |
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
GB | 05.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
FR | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | CZ | 12.11.2008 | |
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
FR | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | CZ | 12.11.2008 | |
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | CZ | 12.11.2008 | |
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | CZ | 12.11.2008 | |
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | CZ | 12.11.2008 | |
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | DK | 12.11.2008 | |
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | DK | 12.11.2008 | |
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | FI | 12.11.2008 | |
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 23.02.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19741554 (BASF COATINGS AG [DE]) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [X]DE19846650 (BASF COATINGS AG [DE]) [X] 1-13 * claim 6 * |