EP1518232 - INTRINSICALLY SAFE PICK-UP FOR REPRODUCTION OR RECORDING DEVICES FOR DIFFERENT OPTICAL RECORDING MEDIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 03.10.2007 [2007/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/20] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2005/13] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing S.A. 46, quai A. Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZUCKER, Friedhelm Innsbrucker Str. 4 78052 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [2005/13] | Representative(s) | Kurth, Dieter Deutsche Thomson OHG Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/13] | Kurth, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH, European Patent Operations, Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 03735633.4 | 16.06.2003 | [2005/13] | WO2003EP06342 | Priority number, date | DE2002129234 | 28.06.2002 Original published format: DE 10229234 | [2005/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004003900 | Date: | 08.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1518232 | Date: | 30.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1518232 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/125, H01S5/0683, H01S5/40 | [2005/13] | CPC: |
G11B7/1263 (EP,US);
G11B7/1275 (EP,US);
G11B2007/0006 (EP,US);
H01S5/0427 (EP,US);
H01S5/0683 (EP,US);
H01S5/4087 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/42] |
Former [2005/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EIGENSICHERER ABTASTKOPF FÜR WIEDERGABE- ODER AUFNAHMEGERÄTE FÜR VERSCHIEDENE OPTISCHE SPEICHERMEDIEN | [2005/13] | English: | INTRINSICALLY SAFE PICK-UP FOR REPRODUCTION OR RECORDING DEVICES FOR DIFFERENT OPTICAL RECORDING MEDIA | [2005/13] | French: | CAPTEUR A SECURITE INTRINSEQUE POUR DISPOSITIFS DE LECTURE OU D'ENREGISTREMENT DE DIFFERENTS SUPPORTS D'ENREGISTREMENT OPTIQUES | [2005/13] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/13] | 07.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 17.05.2006 | [2007/40] | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP1170840 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,7,10,11,16,18-20 * column 2, line 13 - column 4, line 6; figure 12 * [Y] 4,6,8,12; | [X]EP1067529 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,7,10,11,16,18-20 * paragraphs [0013] - [0024]; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP1005121 (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 6,8,12 * paragraphs [0014] - [0018]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US6295260 (SHIHARA TETUYA [JP], et al) [Y] 4,12 * abstract *; | [A]JPH10209545 ; | [E]WO03050808 (THOMSON LICENSING SA [FR], et al) [E] 1-5,7,10,11,16-18,20 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981130), vol. 1998, no. 13, & JP10209545 A 19980807 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * abstract * |